Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0721752

EP0721752 - Arrangement in a recline chair [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.03.2002
Database last updated on 16.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.03.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 02.05.2002  [2002/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ekornes ASA
6222 Ikornes / NO
[N/P]
Former [1999/37]For all designated states
EKORNES ASA
6222 Ikornes / NO
Former [1996/49]For all designated states
J.E. EKORNES A/S
Postboks 23
N-6222 Ikornnes / NO
Former [1996/29]For all designated states
J.E. EKORNES A/S
Postboks 23
N-6222 Ikornes / NO
Inventor(s)01 / Oplenskdal, Olav
6230 Sykkylven / NO
02 / Ekornes, Arve
6222 Ikornnes / NO
03 / Ekornes, Jostein
6222 Ikornnes / NO
[1996/29]
Representative(s)Barlow, Roy James , et al
J.A. KEMP & CO. 14, South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/37]Barlow, Roy James , et al
J.A. KEMP & CO. 14, South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5LX / GB
Former [1996/29]Barlow, Roy James
J.A. KEMP & CO. 14, South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5LX / GB
Application number, filing date96104760.225.09.1991
[1996/29]
Priority number, dateNO1990000442412.10.1990         Original published format: NO 904424
[1996/29]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0721752
Date:17.07.1996
Language:EN
[1996/29]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0721752
Date:14.05.1997
[1997/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0721752
Date:09.05.2001
Language:EN
[2001/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.03.1997
ClassificationInternational:A47C1/032, A47C1/036
[1996/29]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1996/29]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung für einen neigungsverstellbaren Stuhl[1996/29]
English:Arrangement in a recline chair[1996/29]
French:Dispositif pour chaise inclinable[1996/29]
Examination procedure26.03.1996Examination requested  [1996/29]
30.06.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
22.09.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
06.11.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.01.2001Fee for grant paid
26.01.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP91917744.4  / EP0552219
Opposition(s)12.02.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.03.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
26.03.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
26.03.1996Renewal fee patent year 05
12.09.1996Renewal fee patent year 06
26.09.1997Renewal fee patent year 07
09.09.1998Renewal fee patent year 08
13.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 09
13.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[DA]EP0164267  (HAUSERMAN INC [US]) [DA] 1,2,5 * the whole document *;
 [A]FR1256526  (SCHLIEPHACKE) [A] 4 * page 4, column 1, paragraph 1 - column 2, paragraph 1; figures 7,8 *;
 [A]DE2952064  (VOLKSWAGENWERK AG [DE]) [A] 4 * page 7, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2; figure 2 *;
 [A]US3929374  (HOGAN GERARD T, et al) [A] * column W *;
 [DA]US4040661  (HOGAN GERARD T, et al) [DA] * column W *;
 [A]EP0277870  (TOUSALON FRANCE S A [FR], et al)