Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0735070

EP0735070 - Curing agents for elastic epoxy resin compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.11.2000
Database last updated on 20.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip19.09.2008Change - representativepublished on 22.10.2008  [2008/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Vianova Resins GmbH
Boelckestrasse 26
55252 Mainz-Kastel / DE
[2000/02]
Former [1996/40]For all designated states
Vianova Resins GmbH
Boelckestrasse 26
D-55252 Mainz-Kastel / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Marten, Manfred
Am Eiskeller 55
55126 Mainz / DE
02 / Godau, Claus
Halbritterstrasse 9
65399 Kiedrich / DE
03 / Neumann, Uwe, Dr.
Am Höhberg 10a
65307 Bad Schwalbach / DE
[1996/40]
Representative(s)Zounek, Nikolai
Plate Schweitzer Zounek Patentanwälte Rheingaustrasse 196
65203 Wiesbaden / DE
[2008/43]
Former [2000/02]Zounek, Nikolai, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwaltskanzlei Zounek, Industriepark Kalle Albert, Gebäude H287
65203 Wiesbaden / DE
Application number, filing date96104783.426.03.1996
[1996/40]
Priority number, dateDE199511231601.04.1995         Original published format: DE 19512316
[1996/40]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0735070
Date:02.10.1996
Language:DE
[1996/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0735070
Date:12.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP24.07.1996
ClassificationInternational:C08G59/40, C08L63/00
[1996/40]
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   LI,   NL [1998/21]
Former [1996/40]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  IE,  IT,  LI,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Härtungsmittel für elastische Epoxidharz-Systeme[1996/40]
English:Curing agents for elastic epoxy resin compositions[1996/40]
French:Agents de durcissement pour des compositions élastiques de résines époxydes[1996/40]
Examination procedure02.04.1997Examination requested  [1997/23]
22.06.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.11.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
09.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.09.1999Fee for grant paid
30.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.01.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[DA]US4316003  (DANTE MARK F, et al) [DA] 1-3,7,17,18 * column A; claims 1-5 * * column 4, line 1 - column 5, line 2 *;
 [A]EP0473031  (VIANOVA KUNSTHARZ AG [AT]) [A] 1-3 * example 2; claim 1 *;
 [A]EP0559033  (HOECHST AG [DE]) [A] 1,10,17,18 * claims 1,4,10 * * page 6, line 23 - line 26 *;
 [A]US3609121  (LOHSE FRIEDRICH, et al) [A] 1-3,16 * examples 1,4; claims 1,7 * * column 2, line 60 - column 3, line 6 * * column 5, line 3 - line 62 *;
 [PA]EP0675143  (HOECHST AG [DE]) [PA] 1-11,17,18 * claims 1-13 *;
 [PA]DE4344487  (HOECHST AG [DE]) [PA] 1,17,18 * claims 1-11 *;
 [DA]  G.ROKICKI ET AL., DIE ANGEWANDTE MAKROMOLEKULARE CHEMIE, BASEL, CH, (198906), vol. 170, pages 211 - 225, XP000572265 [DA] 1 * page 211 - page 215 * * page 221 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/apmc.1989.051700117