Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0744681

EP0744681 - Flow regulator valve [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.12.2000
Database last updated on 16.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip29.12.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 14.02.2001 [2001/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Baier & Köppel GmbH & Co.
Beethovenstrasse 14
91257 Pegnitz / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/26]For all designated states
Baier & Köppel GmbH & Co.
Beethovenstrasse 14
D-91257 Pegnitz / DE
Former [1996/48]For all designated states
BAIER & KÖPPEL GMBH & CO. Präzisionsapparate
Beethovenstrasse 14
D-91257 Pegnitz / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Pingel, Hans
Hans-Böckler-Strasse 29
91257 Pegnitz / DE
[1996/48]
Representative(s)Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB
Bankgasse 3
90402 Nürnberg / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/51]MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Karolinenstrasse 27
90402 Nürnberg / DE
Former [1996/48]Richter, Bernhard, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwalt, Beethovenstrasse 10
90491 Nürnberg / DE
Application number, filing date96105020.029.03.1996
[1996/48]
Priority number, dateDE1995208440U20.05.1995         Original published format: DE 29508440 U
[1996/48]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0744681
Date:27.11.1996
Language:DE
[1996/48]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0744681
Date:11.12.1996
[1996/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0744681
Date:01.03.2000
Language:DE
[2000/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.10.1996
ClassificationInternational:G05D7/01, F16N27/00
[1996/48]
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   ES,   FR,   IT [1996/48]
Extension statesSI29.03.1996
TitleGerman:Stromregelventil[1996/48]
English:Flow regulator valve[1996/48]
French:Soupage de régulation de débit[1996/48]
Examination procedure07.05.1997Examination requested  [1997/28]
27.04.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
10.08.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.10.1999Fee for grant paid
22.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)02.12.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.02.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
27.02.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[A]DE2807542  (HERION WERKE KG) [A] 1 * page 4, line 33 - page 5, line 22 * * page 8, line 7 - page 10, line 22; figure 1 *;
 [DA]DE2008852  (WERKZEUGMASCHINENFABRIK OERLIKON-BÜHRLE AG) [DA] 1 * column 3, line 33 - column 4, line 65; figure 3 *;
 [A]DE1498280  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]US3112764  (ANDERSON JOHN P, et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 44 - column 4, line 65; figures 1,2 *;
 [DA]DE2241397  (HANS SCHIEDRUM MASCHINENFABRIK) [DA] 1 * the whole document *