Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0735563

EP0735563 - Scanning electron microscope [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.08.2003
Database last updated on 17.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 17.09.2003  [2003/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hitachi, Ltd.
6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 101 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2002/39]For all designated states
Hitachi, Ltd.
6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101 / JP
Former [1996/40]For all designated states
HITACHI, LTD.
6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kobaru, Atsushi
Hitachi Wing 410, 11-1, Aoba-cho
Hitachinaka-shi, Ibaraki 312 / JP
02 / Otaka, Tadashi
4851-29, Nakane
Hitachinaka-shi, Ibaraki 312 / JP
03 / Maeda, Tatsuya
Hitachi Wing 212, 11-1, Aoba-cho
Hitachinaka-shi, Ibaraki 312 / JP
04 / Sasada, Katsuhiro
Hitachi Wing 403, 11-1, Aoba-cho
Hitachinaka-shi, Ibaraki 312 / JP
[1996/40]
Representative(s)Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner
Maximilianstrasse 54
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1996/40]Strehl Schübel-Hopf Groening & Partner
Maximilianstrasse 54
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date96105108.329.03.1996
[1996/40]
Priority number, dateJP1995007277030.03.1995         Original published format: JP 7277095
[1996/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0735563
Date:02.10.1996
Language:EN
[1996/40]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0735563
Date:19.03.1997
[1997/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0735563
Date:25.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.01.1997
ClassificationInternational:H01J37/22, H01J37/21
[1997/11]
Former International [1996/40]H01J37/22
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1996/40]
TitleGerman:Rasterelektronenmikroskop[1996/40]
English:Scanning electron microscope[1996/40]
French:Microscope électronique à balayage[1996/40]
Examination procedure12.09.1997Examination requested  [1997/45]
13.11.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.05.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.07.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.10.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.09.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
20.03.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
08.04.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.07.2002Fee for grant paid
12.07.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.03.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
29.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
23.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
26.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
26.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0279172  (IBM [US]) [X] 1-6 * column 5, line 40 - column 6, line 58; figure - *;
 [DA]JPS63254649  ;
 [A]EP0641011  (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 1,2,4 * abstract *;
 [A]JPH01120749
 [DA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890216), vol. 013, no. 068, Database accession no. (E - 716), [DA] 1,2,4 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890814), vol. 013, no. 364, Database accession no. (E - 805), [A] 1,2,4 * abstract *