Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0736660

EP0736660 - Door sill [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.11.2000
Database last updated on 16.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.09.2003Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): DK
published on 12.11.2003  [2003/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Niemann, Hans Dieter
Am Hügel 17
50169 Kerpen-Horrem / DE
[N/P]
Former [1996/41]For all designated states
Niemann, Hans-Dieter
Am Hügel 17
D-50169 Kerpen-Horrem / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Niemann, Hans Dieter
Am Hügel 17
50169 Kerpen-Horrem / DE
02 / Ahrens, Maik
Geistinger Strasse 6
53773 Honnef / DE
[1996/41]
Representative(s)Eichler, Peter
Sturies - Eichler - Füssel Patentanwälte, Lönsstrasse 55
42289 Wuppertal / DE
[N/P]
Former [1996/41]Eichler, Peter, Dipl.-Ing.
Sturies - Eichler - Füssel Patentanwälte, Brahmsstrasse 29
42289 Wuppertal / DE
Application number, filing date96105266.902.04.1996
[1996/41]
Priority number, dateDE1995205829U05.04.1995         Original published format: DE 29505829 U
[1996/41]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0736660
Date:09.10.1996
Language:DE
[1996/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0736660
Date:26.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.08.1996
ClassificationInternational:E06B1/70
[1996/41]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [1996/41]
TitleGerman:Türschwelle[1996/41]
English:Door sill[1996/41]
French:Seuil de porte[1996/41]
Examination procedure10.01.1997Examination requested  [1997/11]
18.05.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
30.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.10.1999Fee for grant paid
07.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.04.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
26.04.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB26.01.2000
DK26.04.2000
BE30.04.2000
[2003/46]
Former [2001/22]GB26.01.2000
BE30.04.2000
Former [2001/12]GB26.01.2000
Documents cited:Search[A]US3235917  (SKUBIC LEROY F) [A] 1,2,7-9,11 * column 2, paragraph L - column 3, line 55; figure - *;
 [A]US3900967  (BURSK WILLIAM MICHAEL, et al) [A] 1-3,5,6 * column 4, line 34 - column 5, line 43; figure - *;
 [A]US4040228  (SKUBIC LEROY F) [A] 1 * abstract *