Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0738039

EP0738039 - Resonator ladder surface acoustic wave filter [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.04.2001
Database last updated on 22.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip17.10.2008Change - applicantpublished on 19.11.2008  [2008/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka
571-8501 / JP
[2008/47]
Former [1996/42]For all designated states
Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd.
1006-banchi, Oaza Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Seki, Shun-ichi
3-4-1-402 Kema
Amagasaki-shi, Hyogo 661 / JP
02 / Eda, Kazuo
2-20-26 Tezukayamam-inami
Nara-shi, Nara 631 / JP
03 / Taguchi, Yutaka
33-3 Nishimachi
Takatsuki-shi, Osaka 569 / JP
04 / Onishi, Keiji
2-2-10 Ichitsuya
Settsu-shi, Osaka 566 / JP
05 / Sato, Hiroki
2-26-3-411 Yagumokitamachi
Moriguchi-shi, Osaka 570 / JP
06 / Kawasaki, Osamu
3-12-1 Matsuigaoka, Tanabe-cho
Tsuzuki-gun, Kyoto 610-03 / JP
[1996/42]
Representative(s)Hafner, Dieter
Patentanwaltskanzlei
Dr. D. Hafner
Schleiermacherstrasse 25
90491 Nürnberg / DE
[N/P]
Former [1996/42]Hafner, Dieter, Dr.rer.nat., Dipl.-Phys.
Dr. Hafner & Stippl, Patentanwälte, Ostendstrasse 132
90482 Nürnberg / DE
Application number, filing date96105312.103.04.1996
[1996/42]
Priority number, dateJP1995008684012.04.1995         Original published format: JP 8684095
JP1995021174421.08.1995         Original published format: JP 21174495
[1996/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0738039
Date:16.10.1996
Language:EN
[1996/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0738039
Date:28.06.2000
Language:EN
[2000/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.07.1996
ClassificationInternational:H03H9/64
[1996/42]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   SE [1996/42]
TitleGerman:Resonateur-Kettenfilter mit akustischen Oberflächenwellen[1996/42]
English:Resonator ladder surface acoustic wave filter[1996/42]
French:Filtre-résonateur en échelle à ondes acoustiques de surface[1996/42]
Examination procedure20.09.1996Examination requested  [1996/47]
26.07.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
01.12.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.01.2000Fee for grant paid
28.01.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)29.03.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.04.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
28.04.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
26.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]JPH06188673  ;
 [A]EP0541284  (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [A] 1,2 * page 10, line 36 - page 11, line 53; figures 29-41 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19941007), vol. 018, no. 531, Database accession no. (E - 1614), [A] 1,2 * abstract *