Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0738713

EP0738713 - Process for the preparation of pesticidal 1-(chloroaryl)heterocyclic compounds [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1996/43]Process for the preparation of pesticidal 1-(haloaryl)heterocyclic compounds
[1999/16]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.12.2000
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.12.2003Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR
published on 11.02.2004  [2004/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
RHONE-POULENC AGROCHIMIE
14-20, rue Pierre Baizet
69009 Lyon / FR
[1996/43]
Inventor(s)01 / Huang, Jamin
233 Old Forest Creek Dr., Chapel Hill
North Carolina 27514 / US
02 / Huber, Scot Kevin
7409 Wisconsin Court
Raleigh, North Carolina 27615 / US
03 / Smith, Philip Henry G.
Fyfield Road
Ongar, Essex CM5 0HW / GB
04 / Wilkinson, John Harry
c/o RHONE-POULENC AGRICULTURE LTD
Fyfield Road, Ongar, Essex CMS 5 OHW / GB
05 / Chene, Alain
La Cerisaie, 92 avenue Pasteur
69370 Saint Didier Au Mont D'Or / FR
[1997/18]
Former [1996/47]01 / Huang, Jamin
233 Old Forest Creek Dr., Chapel Hill
North Carolina 27514 / US
02 / Huber, Scot Kevin
7409 Wisconsin Court
Raleigh, North Carolina 27615 / US
03 / Smith, Philip Henry G.
Fyfield Road
Ongar, Essex CM5 0HW / GB
04 / Wilkinson, John Harry
c/o RHONE-POULENC AGRICULTURE LTD
Fyfield Road, Ongar, Essex CMS 5 OHW / GB
Former [1996/44]01 / Huang, Jamin
233 Old Forest Creek Dr., Chapel Hill
North Carolina 27514 / US
02 / Huber, Scot Kevin
7409 Wisconsin Court
Raleigh, North Carolina 27615 / US
03 / Smith, Philip Henry G.
Fyfield Road
Ongar, Essex CM5 0HW / GB
04 / Wilkinson, John Harry
Ongar
Essex CM5 OH2 / GB
Former [1996/43]01 / Huang, Jamin
Chapel Hill
North Carolina 27514 / US
02 / Huber, Scot Kevin
7409 Wisconsin Court
Raleigh, North Carolina 27615 / US
03 / Smith, Philip Henry G.
Fyfield Road
Ongar, Essex CM5 0HW / GB
04 / Wilkinson, John Harry
Ongar
Essex CM5 OH2 / GB
Representative(s)Bentham, Stephen , et al
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/01]Bentham, Stephen , et al
J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5LX / GB
Application number, filing date96105711.411.04.1996
[1996/43]
Priority number, dateUS1995042665621.04.1995         Original published format: US 426656
[1996/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0738713
Date:23.10.1996
Language:EN
[1996/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0738713
Date:09.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/06]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.09.1996
ClassificationInternational:C07D207/36, C07D401/04, C07D231/18
[1996/43]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [1996/43]
Extension statesSI11.04.1996
TitleGerman:Herstellungsverfahren für 1-(Chloroaryl)heterozyklische Pestizide[1999/16]
English:Process for the preparation of pesticidal 1-(chloroaryl)heterocyclic compounds[1999/16]
French:Procédé de préparation de composés pesticides 1-(chloroaryl) hétérocycliques[1999/16]
Former [1996/43]Herstellungsverfahren für 1-(Haloaryl)heterozyklische Pestizide
Former [1996/43]Process for the preparation of pesticidal 1-(haloaryl)heterocyclic compounds
Former [1996/43]Procédé de préparation de composés pesticides 1-(haloaryl) hétérocycliques
Examination procedure11.04.1996Examination requested  [1996/43]
14.05.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.11.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.01.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.06.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
30.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.10.1999Fee for grant paid
13.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.11.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.03.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
03.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT09.02.2000
BE09.02.2000
FI09.02.2000
GR09.02.2000
NL09.02.2000
DK09.05.2000
PT09.05.2000
SE09.05.2000
ES17.08.2000
[2004/07]
Former [2004/04]AT09.02.2000
BE09.02.2000
FI09.02.2000
NL09.02.2000
DK09.05.2000
PT09.05.2000
SE09.05.2000
ES17.08.2000
Former [2003/46]AT09.02.2000
BE09.02.2000
FI09.02.2000
NL09.02.2000
DK09.05.2000
PT09.05.2000
SE09.05.2000
Former [2003/09]AT09.02.2000
BE09.02.2000
FI09.02.2000
NL09.02.2000
PT09.05.2000
SE09.05.2000
Former [2001/29]AT09.02.2000
BE09.02.2000
FI09.02.2000
PT09.05.2000
SE09.05.2000
Former [2001/09]AT09.02.2000
BE09.02.2000
PT09.05.2000
SE09.05.2000
Former [2001/08]AT09.02.2000
BE09.02.2000
Documents cited:Search[AD]  J.R. BECK, TETRAHEDRON, (INCL TETRAHEDRON REPORTS), OXFORD GB, (1978), vol. 34, pages 2057 - 2068, XP002011360 [AD] * column W *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0040-4020(78)89004-8
 [A]  J. FITZPATRICK ET AL., JOURNAL OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY, PERKIN TRANSACTIONS 2, LETCHWORTH GB, (1984), pages 927 - 932, XP002011361 [A] * column W *
 [A]  J.H. CLARK ET AL., TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, OXFORD GB, (1985), vol. 26, no. 18, pages 2233 - 2236, XP002011362 [A] * column W *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4039(00)98970-6