Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0737962

EP0737962 - Data recording/regenerating method, data recording/regenerating apparatus and use of a data recording medium [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1996/42]Data recording/regenerating method, data recording/regenerating apparatus and data recording medium
[2002/16]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.04.2004
Database last updated on 17.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.04.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 26.05.2004  [2004/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ricoh Company, Ltd.
3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku
Tokyo 143-8555 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1996/42]For all designated states
Ricoh Company, Ltd
3-6, 1-chome Nakamagome
Ohta-ku Tokyo 143 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Iwasaki, Hiroko
c/o Ricoh Co, Ltd, 3-6 Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta-ku
Tokyo 143 / JP
02 / Ide, Yukio
c/o Ricoh Co, Ltd, 3-6 Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta-ku
Tokyo 143 / JP
03 / Kageyama, Yoshiyuki
c/o Ricoh Co, Ltd, 3-6 Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta-ku
Tokyo 143 / JP
04 / Harigaya, Makoto
c/o Ricoh Co, Ltd, 3-6 Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta-ku
Tokyo 143 / JP
05 / Abe, Michiharu
c/o Ricoh Co, Ltd, 3-6 Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta-ku
Tokyo 143 / JP
[1996/42]
Representative(s)SSM Sandmair
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt
Partnerschaft mbB
Joseph-Wild-Straße 20
81829 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1996/42]Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx
Stuntzstrasse 16
81677 München / DE
Application number, filing date96105794.012.04.1996
[1996/42]
Priority number, dateJP1995008946414.04.1995         Original published format: JP 8946495
JP1995020102107.08.1995         Original published format: JP 20102195
JP1995023254711.09.1995         Original published format: JP 23254795
JP1996008530708.04.1996         Original published format: JP 8530796
[1996/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0737962
Date:16.10.1996
Language:EN
[1996/42]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0737962
Date:23.04.1997
[1997/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0737962
Date:04.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.03.1997
ClassificationInternational:G11B7/00, G11B7/125, G11B20/10, G11B20/18, G11B7/24
[1996/42]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [1996/42]
TitleGerman:Datenaufzeichnungs-/-wiedergabeverfahren, Datenaufzeichnungs-/-wiedergabegerät und Verwendung eines Datenaufzeichnungsmedium[2002/16]
English:Data recording/regenerating method, data recording/regenerating apparatus and use of a data recording medium[2002/16]
French:Procédé d'enregistrement/lecture des données, appareil d'enregistrement/lecture des données et utilisation d'un support d'enregistrement des données[2002/16]
Former [1996/42]Datenaufzeichnungs-/-wiedergabeverfahren, Datenaufzeichnungs-/-wiedergabegerät und Datenaufzeichnungsmedium
Former [1996/42]Data recording/regenerating method, data recording/regenerating apparatus and data recording medium
Former [1996/42]Procédé d'enregistrement/lecture des données, appareil d'enregistrement/lecture des données et milieu d'enregistrement des données
MiscellaneousEPB 1997/17: Teilanmeldung 97101285.1 eingereicht am 28/01/97
EPB 1997/17: Divisional application 97101285.1 filed on 28/01/97
EPB 1997/17: Demande divisionnaire 97101285.1 déposée le 28/01/97
Examination procedure12.04.1996Examination requested  [1996/42]
28.01.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.07.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.08.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.10.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.11.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.03.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.04.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.07.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.03.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
08.10.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.01.2003Fee for grant paid
08.01.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP02021830.1  / EP1271488
EP06119244.9  / EP1739661
EP97101285.1  / EP0778565
Opposition(s)05.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.03.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
30.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
28.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
28.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[YA]DE4217279  (RICOH KK [JP]) [Y] 54 * abstract * * page 3, line 38 - line 51 * * page 4, line 18 - line 39 * * page 5, line 45 - page 6, line 9; figure 1 * [A] 1,9,21,25,33,34,45,46,48-53,55-59;
 [XA]EP0405610  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 13,20,37,45,46,49 * page 5, line 33 - page 6, line 39 * * page 8, line 38 - line 45; figures 3,9 * [A] 1,2,7-12,14,19-24,31-35,38,50-59;
 [D]US5150351  (OHNO EIJI [JP], et al);
 [A]EP0587111  (PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORP [JP]) [A] 3,4,15,16,27,28,39,40 * column 5, line 8 - line 16; figure 3 *
 [XAY]  KENICHI NISHIUCHI ET AL, "FEASIBILITY STUDY OF GE-SB-TE PHASE-CHANGE OPTICAL DISK MEDIUM FOR ONE-PASS OVERWRITE DIGITAL AUDIO RECORDING", JAPANESE JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, TOKYO, JP, (19920201), vol. 31, no. 2B, pages 653 - 658, XP000323494 [X] 13,19-24,37,43-47,49-53,55-59 * the whole document * [A] 1,2,7-12,14,25,26,31-35,38,54 [Y] 54

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1143/JJAP.31.653