blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0737799


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
29.08.2008 Change - representative published on  01.10.2008  [2008/40]
18.04.2008 Change - lapse in a contracting state published on  21.05.2008  [2008/21]
04.02.2000 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.03.2000 [2000/12]
26.11.1999 No opposition filed within time limit published on  12.01.2000 [2000/02]
04.12.1998 (Expected) grant published on  20.01.1999 [1999/03]
29.10.1998 Communication of intention to grant a patent
07.07.1998 Communication of intention to grant
07.07.1998 Communication of intention to grant a patent
23.04.1998 Renewal fee
16.02.1998 Communication of intention to grant
13.11.1997 Examination report or reply
23.09.1997 Examination report or reply
09.05.1997 First examination report
07.05.1997 Examination report or reply
30.08.1996 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  16.10.1996 [1996/42]
30.08.1996 Request for examination filed published on  16.10.1996 [1996/42]