Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0737799

EP0737799 - Valve timing control apparatus for engine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.11.1999
Database last updated on 20.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip29.08.2008Change - representativepublished on 01.10.2008  [2008/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha
1, Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1999/03]For all designated states
TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1, Toyota-cho, Toyota-shi
Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP
Former [1996/42]For all designated states
TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi
Aichi-ken 471 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kato, Senji
13-14, Higashiyamadai, Miyoshi-cho
Nishikamo-gun, Aichi-ken 470-02 / JP
02 / Yasumura, Atsushi
31-1, Suigen-cho 5-chome
Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471 / JP
03 / Ohkawa, Nobuhisa
128-6, Tanaka-cho 1-chome
Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471 / JP
04 / Naganawa, Tadahisa
14-8, Ohbayashi-cho 14-chome
Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 473 / JP
[1996/42]
Representative(s)Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte - Partnerschaft mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei
Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22
85354 Freising / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/40]Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner Röss, Kaiser, Polte Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei
Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22
85354 Freising / DE
Former [1996/42]KUHNEN, WACKER & PARTNER
Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22
D-85354 Freising / DE
Application number, filing date96105809.612.04.1996
[1996/42]
Priority number, dateJP1995008844113.04.1995         Original published format: JP 8844195
JP1995021498623.08.1995         Original published format: JP 21498695
[1996/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0737799
Date:16.10.1996
Language:EN
[1996/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0737799
Date:20.01.1999
Language:EN
[1999/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.07.1996
ClassificationInternational:F01L1/344, F02D13/02
[1996/42]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1996/42]
TitleGerman:Ventilsteuervorrichtung für Brennkraftmaschine[1996/42]
English:Valve timing control apparatus for engine[1996/42]
French:Dispositif de commande du calage des soupapes pour moteur à combustion intèrne[1996/42]
Examination procedure09.05.1996Examination requested  [1996/42]
12.05.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.11.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.02.1998Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
10.07.1998Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.10.1998Fee for grant paid
20.10.1998Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)21.10.1999No opposition filed within time limit [2000/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.04.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  Tooltipdeleted
[2008/21]
Former [2000/12]DE21.04.1999
Documents cited:Search[A]US5103780  (ISHII AKIRA [JP]) [A] 1,10-13 * column W *;
 [A]GB2272960  (NIPPON DENSO CO [JP]) [A] 1 * pages 13-16; figure - *;
 [A]US4928640  (VAN VUUREN WILLEM N J [US], et al) [A] 1 * column W *;
 [AP]GB2288037  (NIPPON DENSO CO [JP]) [AP] 1 * the whole document *
ExaminationEP0735245