blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0739866

EP0739866 - Piezoelectric ceramics [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.11.2000
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip13.11.2009Change - representativepublished on 16.12.2009  [2009/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MURATA MANUFACTURING CO., LTD.
26-10, Tenjin 2-chome Nagaokakyo-shi
Kyoto-fu 226 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1996/44]For all designated states
MURATA MANUFACTURING CO., LTD.
26-10, Tenjin 2-chome
Nagaokakyo-shi Kyoto-fu 226 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Hayashi, Kohichi, c/o Murata Manufact. Co., Ltd.
26-10, Tenjin 2-chome
Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto-fu / JP
02 / Nada, Kenichi, c/o Murata Manufact. Co., Ltd.
26-10, Tenjin 2-chome
Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto-fu / JP
03 / Shiratsuyu, Kosuke, c/o Murata Manufact. Co., Ltd.
26-10, Tenjin 2-chome
Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto-fu / JP
[1996/44]
Representative(s)Zinnecker, Armin, et al
Lorenz Seidler Gossel
Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte
Partnerschaft mbB
Widenmayerstrasse 23
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/51]Zinnecker, Armin, et al
Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte - Patentanwälte Widenmayerstrasse 23
80538 München / DE
Former [1996/44]Zinnecker, Armin, Dipl.-Ing., et al
Lorenz-Seidler-Gossel, Widenmayerstrasse 23
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date96106134.818.04.1996
[1996/44]
Priority number, dateJP1995012092921.04.1995         Original published format: JP 12092995
[1996/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0739866
Date:30.10.1996
Language:EN
[1996/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0739866
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.08.1996
ClassificationIPC:C04B35/493, H01L41/24
[1996/44]
CPC:
C04B35/493 (EP,KR,US); H10N30/8554 (KR); H10N30/853 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1996/44]
TitleGerman:Piezoelektrische Keramiken[1996/44]
English:Piezoelectric ceramics[1996/44]
French:Céramiques piézoélectriques[1996/44]
Examination procedure11.09.1996Examination requested  [1996/45]
18.12.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.06.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.01.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.06.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.08.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.03.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.06.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
06.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.10.1999Fee for grant paid
07.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.04.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
29.04.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]JPS63185080  ;
 [X]GB1184888  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-5 * page 2, line 25 - page 3, line 13; figure 2; claims 1-3; tables 1,2 *;
 [X]DE1796226  (SIEMENS AG) [X] 1-5 * page 3, line 24 - line 25; claims 1,2,4,5 *;
 [X]EP0338799  (ALCAN INT LTD [CA]) [X] 1,8 * page 2, line 27 - line 38 * * page 4, line 26 - line 30; example 6; claims 4,9 *;
 [X]DE4325167  (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [X] 1,2,5 * page 2, line 31 - line 67 *;
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 88, no. 36, Database accession no. 88-254021, XP002010406 & JPS63185080 A 19880730 (DENKI KAGAKU KOGYO KK) [X] 1,2,5 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.