Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0739035

EP0739035 - DRAM bit line contact [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  18.02.2005
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip18.02.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 06.04.2005  [2005/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NEC Electronics Corporation
1753 Shimonumabe Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki, Kanagawa 211-8668 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2003/18]For all designated states
NEC Electronics Corporation
1753 Shimonumabe, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki, Kanagawa 211-8668 / JP
Former [1996/43]For all designated states
NEC CORPORATION
7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Takaishi, Yoshihiro
c/o NEC Corp., 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
[1996/43]
Representative(s)Glawe, Delfs, Moll
Partnerschaft mbB von
Patent- und Rechtsanwälten
Postfach 26 01 62
80058 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1996/43]Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner
Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62
80058 München / DE
Application number, filing date96106136.318.04.1996
[1996/43]
Priority number, dateJP1995009529920.04.1995         Original published format: JP 9529995
[1996/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0739035
Date:23.10.1996
Language:EN
[1996/43]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0739035
Date:02.01.2002
[2002/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.11.2001
ClassificationInternational:H01L27/108, H01L21/8242
[2002/01]
Former International [1996/43]H01L27/108
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB [1996/43]
TitleGerman:DRAM-Bitleitungskontakt[1996/43]
English:DRAM bit line contact[1996/43]
French:Contact de ligne de bit pour DRAM[1996/43]
Examination procedure28.11.2001Examination requested  [2002/05]
18.05.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.09.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/14]
04.11.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2005/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.04.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
19.04.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
14.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
19.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
19.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
22.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 08
20.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[X]DE4232817  (GOLD STAR ELECTRONICS) [X] 1-6 * the whole document *;
 [X]US5185282  (KIM CHEON S ET AL) [X] 1,4,5 * column 3, line 40 - column 4, line 29; figures 2D,4D *;
 [X]US5164881  (AHN JI-HONG) [X] 1,4,5 * the whole document *