Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0742032

EP0742032 - Process for vitrifying compound materials containing asbestos [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.11.2000
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip17.02.2006Change - lapse in a contracting state
Updated state(s): FR
published on 05.04.2006  [2006/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ENEL S.p.A.
3 Via G.B. Martini
I-00198 Roma / IT
[1996/46]
Inventor(s)01 / De Stefano, Luca
ENEL S.p.A., 21/C Via Dalmazia
72100 Brindisi / IT
02 / Dinelli, Giorgio
ENEL S.p.A., 21/C Via Dalmazia
72100 Brindisi / IT
[1996/46]
Representative(s)Ferraiolo, Ruggero , et al
FERRAIOLO S.r.l.
Via Napo Torriani, 10
20124 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [1996/46]Ferraiolo, Ruggero , et al
FERRAIOLO S.r.l., Via Napo Torriani, 10
20124 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date96106165.219.04.1996
[1996/46]
Priority number, dateIT1995MI0088403.05.1995         Original published format: IT MI950884
[1996/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0742032
Date:13.11.1996
Language:EN
[1996/46]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0742032
Date:02.01.1997
[1997/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0742032
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.11.1996
ClassificationInternational:A62D3/00, C03C1/00
[1997/01]
Former International [1996/46]A62D3/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   LI,   NL,   SE [1996/46]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Verglasen von Asbest enthaltende Verbundwerkstoffen[1999/24]
English:Process for vitrifying compound materials containing asbestos[1996/46]
French:Procédé pour la vitrification des matériaux composites contenant de l'amiante[1996/46]
Former [1996/46]Verfahren zur Verglasen von Amiante enthaltende Verbundwerkstoffen
Examination procedure01.04.1997Examination requested  [1997/23]
17.08.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.12.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.01.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.04.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.05.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
30.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.10.1999Fee for grant paid
18.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.04.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
20.04.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT26.01.2000
BE26.01.2000
CH26.01.2000
ES26.01.2000
FR26.01.2000
GR26.01.2000
LI26.01.2000
NL26.01.2000
SE26.01.2000
IE19.04.2000
DK26.04.2000
GB26.04.2000
DE27.04.2000
[2006/14]
Former [2004/07]AT26.01.2000
BE26.01.2000
CH26.01.2000
ES26.01.2000
GR26.01.2000
LI26.01.2000
NL26.01.2000
SE26.01.2000
IE19.04.2000
DK26.04.2000
GB26.04.2000
DE27.04.2000
FR23.06.2000
Former [2003/46]AT26.01.2000
BE26.01.2000
CH26.01.2000
ES26.01.2000
LI26.01.2000
NL26.01.2000
SE26.01.2000
IE19.04.2000
DK26.04.2000
GB26.04.2000
DE27.04.2000
FR23.06.2000
Former [2003/09]AT26.01.2000
BE26.01.2000
CH26.01.2000
ES26.01.2000
LI26.01.2000
NL26.01.2000
SE26.01.2000
IE19.04.2000
GB26.04.2000
DE27.04.2000
FR23.06.2000
Former [2002/26]AT26.01.2000
BE26.01.2000
CH26.01.2000
ES26.01.2000
LI26.01.2000
SE26.01.2000
IE19.04.2000
GB26.04.2000
DE27.04.2000
FR23.06.2000
Former [2002/23]AT26.01.2000
BE26.01.2000
CH26.01.2000
LI26.01.2000
SE26.01.2000
IE19.04.2000
GB26.04.2000
DE27.04.2000
FR23.06.2000
Former [2002/11]AT26.01.2000
BE26.01.2000
CH26.01.2000
LI26.01.2000
IE19.04.2000
GB26.04.2000
DE27.04.2000
FR23.06.2000
Former [2001/50]AT26.01.2000
BE26.01.2000
CH26.01.2000
LI26.01.2000
IE19.04.2000
GB26.04.2000
FR23.06.2000
Former [2001/17]AT26.01.2000
BE26.01.2000
CH26.01.2000
LI26.01.2000
GB26.04.2000
FR23.06.2000
Former [2001/09]AT26.01.2000
BE26.01.2000
CH26.01.2000
LI26.01.2000
FR23.06.2000
Former [2001/08]AT26.01.2000
BE26.01.2000
CH26.01.2000
LI26.01.2000
Former [2000/52]CH26.01.2000
LI26.01.2000
Former [2000/50]CH01.05.2000
LI01.05.2000
Documents cited:Search[X]DE4004201  (ORTLEPP WOLFGANG) [X] 1-3 * example -; claim - *;
 [X]JPH02303585  ;
 [PX]EP0684054  (METALLGESELLSCHAFT AG) [PX] 1-3 * page 3, line 53 - page 4, line 8; claims 1-4 *;
 [A]WO9423801  (ROCKWOOL INT ;CLAUSEN ANDERS ULF (DK); CHRISTENSEN VERMUND RUST (D);
 [A]DE4211161  (KERAMIT GMBH)
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 91, no. 05, Database accession no. 91-033567, XP002017907 & JPH02303585 A 19901217 (KUBOTA CORP) [X] 1-3 * abstract *