Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0742403

EP0742403 - A fluid tight coupling [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.04.2002
Database last updated on 13.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip05.04.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 22.05.2002  [2002/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
VALEO
43, rue Bayen
75017 Paris / FR
[1996/46]
Inventor(s)01 / Tobiasz, André
4 Allée Rude
93800 Epinay sur Seine / FR
[1996/46]
Representative(s)Gamonal, Didier
Valeo Management Services
Propriété Industrielle
2 Rue Andrée Boulle
B.P. 150
94004 Créteil / FR
[N/P]
Former [1996/46]Gamonal, Didier
Valeo Management Services Sce Propriété Industrielle 2, rue André Boulle B.P. 150
94004 Créteil / FR
Application number, filing date96106648.726.04.1996
[1996/46]
Priority number, dateFR1995000531928.04.1995         Original published format: FR 9505319
[1996/46]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0742403
Date:13.11.1996
Language:FR
[1996/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0742403
Date:23.05.2001
Language:FR
[2001/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.07.1996
ClassificationInternational:F16L37/32
[1996/46]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   GB,   IT,   NL [1996/46]
TitleGerman:Fluiddichtkupplung[1996/46]
English:A fluid tight coupling[1996/46]
French:Raccord hydraulique étanche[1996/46]
Examination procedure22.04.1997Examination requested  [1997/26]
23.09.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.03.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.09.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
16.11.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.02.2001Fee for grant paid
15.02.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.02.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.04.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
25.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
03.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
20.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[A]GB2195729  (AUTOMOTIVE PRODUCTS PLC) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [AD]FR2688291  (AUTOMOTIVE PROD FRANCE [FR]) [AD] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]FR864604  (L. LEVY) [A] 1 * figures 1-3 *