Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0741119

EP0741119 - Composite propellant and process for the manufacture thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.12.2000
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.12.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 31.01.2001 [2001/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V.
Leonrodstrasse 54
80636 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1996/45]For all designated states
FRAUNHOFER-GESELLSCHAFT ZUR FÖRDERUNG DER ANGEWANDTEN FORSCHUNG E.V.
Leonrodstrasse 54
80636 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Menke, Klaus, Dr.
Näherweg 11
76646 Bruchsal / DE
02 / Brehler, Klaus-Peter, Dr.
Klotzbergstrasse 8
77815 Bühl / DE
03 / Böhnlein-Mauss, Jutta, Dr.
Gabriel-Biel-Strasse 4
67346 Speyer / DE
[2000/07]
Former [1996/45]01 / Menke, Klaus, Dr.
Näherweg 11
76646 Bruchsal / DE
02 / Brehler, Klaus-Peter, Dr.
Gewerbestrasse 20
76327 Pfinztal / DE
03 / Böhnlein-Mauss, Jutta, Dr.
Gabriel-Biel-Strasse 4
67346 Speyer / DE
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[1999/43]
Former [1996/45]Dipl.-Ing. Heiner Lichti Dipl.-Phys. Dr.rer.nat. Jost Lempert Dipl.-Ing. Hartmut Lasch
Postfach 41 07 60
76207 Karlsruhe / DE
Application number, filing date96106862.401.05.1996
[1996/45]
Priority number, dateDE199511652805.05.1995         Original published format: DE 19516528
[1996/45]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0741119
Date:06.11.1996
Language:DE
[1996/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0741119
Date:16.02.2000
Language:DE
[2000/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.09.1996
ClassificationInternational:C06B23/00
[1996/45]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   NL [1996/45]
TitleGerman:Composit-Festtreibstoff und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung[1996/45]
English:Composite propellant and process for the manufacture thereof[1996/45]
French:Propergol composite et son procédé de fabrication[1996/45]
Examination procedure31.01.1997Examination requested  [1997/14]
14.07.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
11.08.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.09.1999Fee for grant paid
15.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.11.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.05.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
24.04.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[A]US3447981  (SAYLES DAVID C) [A] 1,21 * column 1, line 36 - line 51; claim - *;
 [DA]US3781179  (HUSKINS C, et al) [DA] 1,21 * column 2, line 3 - line 39; claim - *;
 [A]US4023994  (ARENDALE WILLIAM F) [A] 1,21 * claim 1 *;
 [A]US3322804  (PRUETT ROY L) [A] 1,21 * column 1, line 17 - line 58; claim - *;
 [DA]US3968126  (NORRIS WILLIAM P) [DA] 1,21 * column 1, line 41 - column 3, line 12 *;
 [PX]  - J. BOEHNLEIN-MAUSS ET AL., "New chemically bound ferrocenes for burn rate modification of composite rocket and gas generating propellants.", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19960304), vol. 124, no. 10, Database accession no. 121356h, XP002010770 [PX] 1-21 * abstract *
    [] - INT. ANNU. CONF. ICT 1995, 26TH(PYROTECHNICS), 53/1-53/16,