Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0728575

EP0728575 - Vacuum insulation panels [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1996/35]Getter structure for vacuum insulation panels
[1999/15]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.11.2000
Database last updated on 20.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.12.2003Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR
published on 11.02.2004  [2004/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
WHIRLPOOL CORPORATION
2000 M-63 Benton Harbor
Michigan 49022 / US
[N/P]
Former [1996/35]For all designated states
WHIRLPOOL CORPORATION
2000 M-63
Benton Harbor Michigan 49022 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Cur, Nihat Omer
2521 Bristol Terrace
St. Joseph, Michigan 49085 / US
02 / Kirby, David Bruce
1775 Meadow Grove Place
St Joseph, Michigan 49085 / US
[1996/46]
Former [1996/35]01 / Cur, Nihat Omer
2521 Bristol Terrace
St. Joseph, Michigan 49085 / US
02 / Kirby, David Bruce
278 Fisk Road
Benton Arbor, Michigan 49022 / US
Representative(s)Allen, William Guy Fairfax , et al
J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [1996/35]Allen, William Guy Fairfax , et al
J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5LX / GB
Application number, filing date96106900.222.11.1990
[1996/35]
Priority number, dateUS1989045206818.12.1989         Original published format: US 452068
[1996/35]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0728575
Date:28.08.1996
Language:EN
[1996/35]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0728575
Date:08.04.1998
[1998/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0728575
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.02.1998
ClassificationInternational:B32B27/06, F16L59/06
[1996/35]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1996/35]
TitleGerman:Vakuumisolationspaneele[1999/15]
English:Vacuum insulation panels[1999/15]
French:Panneaux à isolation sous vide[1999/15]
Former [1996/35]Getterstruktur für Vakuumisolationspaneele
Former [1996/35]Getter structure for vacuum insulation panels
Former [1996/35]Structure getter pour panneaux à isolation sous vide
Examination procedure02.05.1996Examination requested  [1996/35]
15.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
14.06.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.09.1999Fee for grant paid
08.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP90312715.7  / EP0434226
Opposition(s)20.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.05.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
02.05.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
02.05.1996Renewal fee patent year 05
02.05.1996Renewal fee patent year 06
11.11.1996Renewal fee patent year 07
10.11.1997Renewal fee patent year 08
10.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 09
12.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT19.01.2000
BE19.01.2000
CH19.01.2000
ES19.01.2000
GR19.01.2000
LI19.01.2000
NL19.01.2000
SE19.01.2000
DK19.04.2000
[2004/07]
Former [2003/46]AT19.01.2000
BE19.01.2000
CH19.01.2000
ES19.01.2000
LI19.01.2000
NL19.01.2000
SE19.01.2000
DK19.04.2000
Former [2003/09]AT19.01.2000
BE19.01.2000
CH19.01.2000
ES19.01.2000
LI19.01.2000
NL19.01.2000
SE19.01.2000
Former [2002/26]AT19.01.2000
BE19.01.2000
CH19.01.2000
ES19.01.2000
LI19.01.2000
SE19.01.2000
Former [2002/23]AT19.01.2000
BE19.01.2000
CH19.01.2000
LI19.01.2000
SE19.01.2000
Former [2001/08]AT19.01.2000
BE19.01.2000
CH19.01.2000
LI19.01.2000
Former [2000/52]CH19.01.2000
LI19.01.2000
Former [2000/50]CH25.04.2000
LI25.04.2000
Documents cited:Search[AD]US4726974  (NOWOBILSKI JEFFERT J [US], et al) [AD] 1-14 * the whole document *;
 [AD]US4444821  (YOUNG JAMES R [US], et al) [AD] 1-14 * the whole document *;
 [A]AU504290B  (VALYI EMERY I) [A] 1 * page 5, line 1 - line 30 * * page 7, line 21 - page 8, line 7 * * page 9, line 20 - line 26 * * page 10, line 6 - line 26 *