Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0742301

EP0742301 - Weaving method for textured patterns [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.09.2001
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.09.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 24.10.2001 [2001/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Musha, Toshimitsu
13-17, Minami-Tsukushino 2-chome Machida-shi
Tokyo / JP
For all designated states
NISSHINBO INDUSTRIES INC.
31-11, Ningyocho 2-chome, Nihonbashi Chuo-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [1996/46]For all designated states
Musha, Toshimitsu
13-17, Minami-Tsukushino 2-chome
Machida-shi, Tokyo / JP
For all designated states
NISSHINBO INDUSTRIES INC.
31-11, Ningyocho 2-chome, Nihonbashi
Chuo-ku, Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Musha, Toshimitsu
13-17, Minami-Tsukushino 2-chome
Machida-shi, Tokyo / JP
02 / Yanai, Yuichi
c/o Nisshinbo Ind. Inc. Miai, 45, Aza Irikomi
Miai-cho, Okazaki-shi, Aichi / JP
03 / Takagi, Shoji
c/o Nisshinbo Ind. Inc. Miai, 45, Aza Irikomi
Miai-cho, Okazaki-shi, Aichi / JP
04 / Ono, Shu
c/o Nisshinbo Ind. Inc. Miai, 45, Aza Irikomi
Miai-cho, Okazaki-shi, Aichi / JP
[1996/46]
Representative(s)Sajda, Wolf E. , et al
Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte
Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Postfach 86 06 24
81633 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1996/46]Sajda, Wolf E., Dipl.-Phys. , et al
MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER Postfach 86 06 24
81633 München / DE
Application number, filing date96107486.110.05.1996
[1996/46]
Priority number, dateJP1995013618810.05.1995         Original published format: JP 13618895
[1996/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0742301
Date:13.11.1996
Language:EN
[1996/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0742301
Date:02.11.2000
Language:EN
[2000/44]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.09.1996
ClassificationInternational:D03D13/00
[1996/46]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1996/46]
TitleGerman:Webverfahren für texturierten Mustern[1996/46]
English:Weaving method for textured patterns[1996/46]
French:Procédé de tissage pour des dessins texturés[1996/46]
Examination procedure15.04.1997Examination requested  [1997/24]
16.12.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.06.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.11.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
04.04.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
19.04.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.07.2000Fee for grant paid
27.07.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.08.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.05.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
26.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
30.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]US2925832  (BOWSER ERNEST R) [A] 1-4 * column 1, line 62 - column 2, line 56; figures 1,3-5 *;
 [AP]EP0668382  (DOLLFUS MIEG ET CIE [FR]);
 [AP]EP0686716  (NISSHIN SPINNING [JP], et al)