blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0755939 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0755939



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 64
03.12.2013 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
17.09.2003 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
04.10.2002 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
01.08.2002 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
01.08.2002 Translation of the claims Search / examination 1
01.08.2002 Translation of the claims Search / examination 1
28.05.2002 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 3
18.05.2002 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
16.04.2002 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
16.04.2002 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
16.04.2002 Text intended for grant Search / examination 10
22.02.2001 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
19.01.2001 Document concerning representation Search / examination 4
09.05.2000 Request for change of address of the applicant Search / examination 4
01.09.1999 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
21.08.1999 Request for assignment Search / examination 2
21.09.1998 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
21.09.1998 European search report Search / examination 2
10.05.1996 Abstract Search / examination 1
10.05.1996 Claims Search / examination 1
10.05.1996 Description Search / examination 9
10.05.1996 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
10.05.1996 Priority document Search / examination 6
10.05.1996 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6