blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0755939


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
04.01.2008 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.02.2008  [2008/06]
16.03.2007 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.04.2007  [2007/16]
17.02.2006 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.04.2006  [2006/14]
03.09.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.10.2004  [2004/43]
06.08.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.09.2004  [2004/39]
21.05.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.07.2004  [2004/28]
09.04.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.05.2004  [2004/22]
05.12.2003 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.01.2004  [2004/04]
19.09.2003 No opposition filed within time limit published on  05.11.2003  [2003/45]
05.09.2003 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.10.2003  [2003/43]
29.08.2003 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.10.2003  [2003/42]
13.06.2003 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  30.07.2003  [2003/31]
06.06.2003 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  23.07.2003  [2003/30]
30.05.2003 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.07.2003  [2003/29]
21.03.2003 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.05.2003  [2003/19]
27.09.2002 (Expected) grant published on  13.11.2002  [2002/46]
21.09.2002 Communication of intention to grant a patent
14.06.2002 Renewal fee
24.05.2002 Communication of intention to grant
24.05.2002 Communication of intention to grant a patent
12.04.2002 Communication of intention to grant
12.04.2002 First examination report
11.06.2001 Renewal fee
23.02.2001 Change - representative published on  11.04.2001 [2001/15]
08.06.2000 Renewal fee
27.08.1999 Change - applicant published on  13.10.1999 [1999/41]
10.06.1999 Renewal fee
13.05.1999 Request for examination filed published on  30.06.1999 [1999/26]
18.09.1998 Publication of search report published on  04.11.1998 [1998/45]
11.09.1998 Change - classification published on  28.10.1998 [1998/44]
16.06.1998 Renewal fee
13.12.1996 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  29.01.1997 [1997/05]