blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0755939
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE59609865D 19.12.2002D1
Priority number Date
DE59609865 10.05.1996
DE19517889 16.05.1995
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JPH08333381Global Dossier 17.12.1996A
Priority number Date
DE19517889 16.05.1995
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0755939Global Dossier 13.11.2002B1
EP0755939 04.11.1998A3
EP0755939 29.01.1997A2
Priority number Date
DE19517889 16.05.1995
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AT227731T 15.11.2002T
Priority number Date
DE19517889 16.05.1995
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CA2176686 17.11.1996A1
Priority number Date
DE19517889 16.05.1995
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE19517889 03.12.1998C2
DE19517889 21.11.1996A1
Priority number Date
DE19517889 16.05.1995
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US5696246 09.12.1997A
Priority number Date
DE19517889 16.05.1995