Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0755939

EP0755939 - Method for the targetted synthesis of beta-glycoside bound N-acetyl glucosamine derivatives [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.09.2003
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 06.02.2008  [2008/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Aventis Research & Technologies GmbH & Co. KG
65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE
[1999/41]
Former [1997/05]For all designated states
HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Brüningstrasse 50
65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Schmidt, Wolfgang, Dr.
Johannesallee 14
65929 Frankfurt / DE
02 / Kretzschmar, Gerhard, Dr.
Ulmenweg 10
65760 Eschborn / DE
[1997/05]
Representative(s)Ackermann, Joachim
Patentanwaltskanzlei Dr. Ackermann
Postfach 11 13 26
60048 Frankfurt am Main / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/15]Ackermann, Joachim, Dr.
Postfach 11 13 26
60048 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Application number, filing date96107500.910.05.1996
[1997/05]
Priority number, dateDE199511788916.05.1995         Original published format: DE 19517889
[1997/05]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0755939
Date:29.01.1997
Language:DE
[1997/05]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0755939
Date:04.11.1998
[1998/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0755939
Date:13.11.2002
Language:DE
[2002/46]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.09.1998
ClassificationInternational:C07H5/06, C07H15/04
[1998/44]
Former International [1997/05]C07H5/06
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [1997/05]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur gezielten Synthese von Beta-glycosidisch verknüpften N-Acetylglucosaminderivaten[1997/05]
English:Method for the targetted synthesis of beta-glycoside bound N-acetyl glucosamine derivatives[1997/05]
French:Méthode pour la synthèse ciblée des dérivés de N-acetylglucosamine liés à bêta-glycoside[1997/05]
Examination procedure04.05.1999Examination requested  [1999/26]
16.04.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
28.05.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.09.2002Fee for grant paid
09.09.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.08.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
31.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
31.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
31.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
31.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI13.11.2002
FR13.11.2002
GB13.11.2002
GR13.11.2002
IE13.11.2002
IT13.11.2002
NL13.11.2002
DK13.02.2003
PT13.02.2003
SE13.02.2003
AT10.05.2003
LU10.05.2003
ES29.05.2003
BE31.05.2003
CH31.05.2003
LI31.05.2003
[2008/06]
Former [2007/16]FI13.11.2002
FR13.11.2002
GB13.11.2002
GR13.11.2002
IE13.11.2002
NL13.11.2002
DK13.02.2003
PT13.02.2003
SE13.02.2003
AT10.05.2003
LU10.05.2003
ES29.05.2003
BE31.05.2003
CH31.05.2003
LI31.05.2003
Former [2006/14]FI13.11.2002
FR13.11.2002
GB13.11.2002
GR13.11.2002
IE13.11.2002
NL13.11.2002
PT13.02.2003
SE13.02.2003
AT10.05.2003
LU10.05.2003
ES29.05.2003
BE31.05.2003
CH31.05.2003
LI31.05.2003
Former [2004/43]FI13.11.2002
GB13.11.2002
GR13.11.2002
IE13.11.2002
NL13.11.2002
PT13.02.2003
SE13.02.2003
AT10.05.2003
LU10.05.2003
ES29.05.2003
BE31.05.2003
CH31.05.2003
LI31.05.2003
Former [2004/39]FI13.11.2002
GB13.11.2002
GR13.11.2002
IE13.11.2002
NL13.11.2002
PT13.02.2003
SE13.02.2003
LU10.05.2003
ES29.05.2003
BE31.05.2003
CH31.05.2003
LI31.05.2003
Former [2004/28]FI13.11.2002
GB13.11.2002
GR13.11.2002
IE13.11.2002
NL13.11.2002
PT13.02.2003
SE13.02.2003
ES29.05.2003
BE31.05.2003
CH31.05.2003
LI31.05.2003
Former [2004/22]FI13.11.2002
GB13.11.2002
GR13.11.2002
IE13.11.2002
NL13.11.2002
PT13.02.2003
SE13.02.2003
ES29.05.2003
CH31.05.2003
LI31.05.2003
Former [2004/04]FI13.11.2002
GR13.11.2002
IE13.11.2002
NL13.11.2002
PT13.02.2003
SE13.02.2003
ES29.05.2003
Former [2003/43]FI13.11.2002
GR13.11.2002
IE13.11.2002
NL13.11.2002
PT13.02.2003
SE13.02.2003
Former [2003/42]GR13.11.2002
IE13.11.2002
NL13.11.2002
PT13.02.2003
SE13.02.2003
Former [2003/31]GR13.11.2002
NL13.11.2002
PT13.02.2003
SE13.02.2003
Former [2003/30]NL13.11.2002
PT13.02.2003
SE13.02.2003
Former [2003/29]PT13.02.2003
SE13.02.2003
Former [2003/19]SE13.02.2003
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0489162  (DRUG DELIVERY SYSTEM INST LTD [JP]) [A] * claim 11 *;
 [DA]  E.R. KUMAR ET AL., "Preparation of ether-linked 2-acetamido-2-deoxy-beta glycolipids via zinc chloride promoted coupling of Ac4GlcNAc-Cl with lipid hydroxy groups", TETRAHEDR. LETT., (1994), vol. 35, pages 505 - 8, XP002075304