EP0743561 - Electrophotographic photosensitive member, process cartridge, and electrophotographic apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.01.2002 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.02.2002 [2002/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/47] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Koichi, Suzuki, c/o Canon K.K. 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Hideyuki, Takai, c/o Canon K.K. 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Mitsuhiro, Kunieda, c/o Canon K.K. 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1996/47] | Representative(s) | Tiedtke, Harro Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/47] | Tiedtke, Harro, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96107814.4 | 15.05.1996 | [1996/47] | Priority number, date | JP19950141420 | 17.05.1995 Original published format: JP 14142095 | [1996/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0743561 | Date: | 20.11.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0743561 | Date: | 21.01.1998 | [1998/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0743561 | Date: | 28.02.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.12.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G03G5/06 | [1996/47] | CPC: |
G03G5/0694 (EP);
G03G5/05 (KR);
G03G15/00 (KR);
G03G5/0679 (EP);
G03G5/0687 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1996/47] | Title | German: | Elektrophotographisches, lichtempfindliches Element, Prozesskassette, und elektrophotographisches Gerät | [1996/47] | English: | Electrophotographic photosensitive member, process cartridge, and electrophotographic apparatus | [1996/47] | French: | Elément photosensible électrophotographique, cartouche de traitement, et appareil électrophotographique | [1996/47] | Examination procedure | 09.06.1998 | Examination requested [1998/33] | 07.04.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.10.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.08.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.11.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 07.11.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.11.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5411828 (KASHIZAKI YOSHIO [JP]) [Y] 1 * the whole document *; | [DY]JPH0337656 ; | [Y]US5190839 (FUJIMAKI YOSHIHIDE [US], et al) [Y] 1 * claim 1 *; | [Y]JPH01270060 ; | [Y]JPS63313165 ; | [Y]JPH01257862 ; | [Y]JPH01246558 ; | [PA]EP0686878 (CANON KK [JP]) [PA] 1 * the whole document *; | [PA]EP0658814 (CANON KK [JP]) [PA] 1 * the whole document * | [DY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910507), vol. 015, no. 176, Database accession no. (P - 1198), & JP03037656 A 19910219 (KONICA CORP) [DY] 1 * abstract * | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 89, no. 49, Database accession no. 89-360425, XP002048228 & JPH01270060 A 19891027 (KONICA CORP) [Y] 1 * abstract * | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 89, no. 06, Database accession no. 89-041982, XP002048229 & JPS63313165 A 19881221 (CANON KK) [Y] 1 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900110), vol. 014, no. 008, Database accession no. (P - 987), & JP01257862 A 19891013 (MITSUBISHI PAPER MILLS LTD) [Y] 1 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19891222), vol. 013, no. 583, Database accession no. (P - 981), & JP01246558 A 19891002 (KONICA CORP) [Y] 1 * abstract * |