blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0747273

EP0747273 - Caliper-type disc brake with stepped rotor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.11.2001
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip07.07.2006Change - lapse in a contracting state
Updated state(s): FR
published on 09.08.2006  [2006/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Continental Teves, Inc.
3000 University Drive
Auburn Hills, MI 48326-2356 / US
[2000/22]
Former [1996/50]For all designated states
ITT MANUFACTURING ENTERPRISES, INC.
1105 North Market Street, Suite 1217
Wilmington, Delaware 19801 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Kullmann, Bernhard
1629 Dancer Dr.
Rochester Hills, MI 48307 / US
02 / Scheibel, Jörg
2190 Dexter Rd.
Auburn Hills, MI 48326 / US
03 / Masserant, Larry
Feldberg Strasse 53-EG
60323 Frankfurt/Main / DE
04 / Keck, Daniel
403 N. Hanlon
Westland, MI 48185 / US
05 / Gottschalk, Werner
2635 Greenstone Drive, Apt. No. 510
Auburn Hills, MI 48326 / US
[1997/11]
Former [1996/50]01 / Kullmann, Bernhard
1629 Dancer Dr.
Rochester Hills, MI 48307 / US
02 / Scheibel, Jörg
2190 Dexter Rd.
Auburn Hills, MI 48326 / US
03 / Masserant, Larry
Feldberg Strasse 53-EG
60323 Frankfurt/Main / DE
04 / Keck, Daniel
403 N. Hanlon
Westland, MI 48185 / US
05 / Gottschalk, Werner
2625 Greenstone Dr. No. 510
Auburn Hills, MI 48326 / US
Representative(s)Portwich, Peter
Continental Teves AG & Co. oHG
Guerickestrasse 7
60488 Frankfurt am Main / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/36]Portwich, Peter
Continental Teves AG & Co. oHG, Guerickestrasse 7
60488 Frankfurt / DE
Former [1996/50]Portwich, Peter
c/o ITT Automotive Europe GmbH Guerickestrasse 7
60488 Frankfurt / DE
Application number, filing date96107975.320.05.1996
[1996/50]
Priority number, dateUS1995048645707.06.1995         Original published format: US 486457
[1996/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0747273
Date:11.12.1996
Language:EN
[1996/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0747273
Date:17.01.2001
Language:EN
[2001/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.09.1996
ClassificationIPC:B60T1/06
[1996/50]
CPC:
B60T1/065 (EP,US); F16D55/224 (EP,US); F16D65/128 (EP,US);
F16D2055/0045 (EP,US); F16D2065/026 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   SE [1996/50]
TitleGerman:Schwimmsattel-Scheibenbremse mit gestufter Bremsscheibe[1996/50]
English:Caliper-type disc brake with stepped rotor[1996/50]
French:Frein à disque à étrier coulissant ayant un disque étagé[2000/16]
Former [1996/50]Frein à disque à étrier coulissant ayyant un disque étagé
Examination procedure11.06.1997Examination requested  [1997/33]
11.06.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.10.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.03.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
26.07.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.11.2000Fee for grant paid
06.11.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)18.10.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2002/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
03.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
04.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR17.01.2001
SE17.01.2001
[2006/32]
Former [2002/23]SE17.01.2001
FR15.06.2001
Former [2002/11]FR15.06.2001
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0177672  (TEVES GMBH ALFRED [DE]) [X] 1 * page 8, line 3 - line 11; figure 1 * * abstract *;
 [A]US4202560  (INBODY MELVIN R [US]);
 [A]US2772756  (HECTOR MAY CLAUDE, et al)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.