Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0747491

EP0747491 - Method of reducing metal oxide in a rotary hearth furnace heated by an oxidizing flame [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.12.2000
Database last updated on 17.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip15.12.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 31.01.2001 [2001/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ARMCO INC.
705 Curtis Street Middletown
Ohio 45044-3999 / US
[N/P]
Former [1996/50]For all designated states
ARMCO INC.
705 Curtis Street
Middletown, Ohio 45044-3999 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Kundrat, David M.
3627 Middleton Ave.
Cincinnati, Ohio 45220 / US
[1996/50]
Representative(s)Beetz & Partner mbB
Patentanwälte
Steinsdorfstrasse 10
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1996/50]Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte
Steinsdorfstrasse 10
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date96108322.724.05.1996
[1996/50]
Priority number, dateUS1995047031106.06.1995         Original published format: US 470311
[1996/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0747491
Date:11.12.1996
Language:EN
[1996/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0747491
Date:16.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.10.1996
ClassificationInternational:C21C5/00, C21B13/10, C22C33/00, C22B5/10, C22C35/00
[1996/50]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   DE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   SE [1996/50]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Metalloxid-Reduktion in einem mittel oxidierender Flamme beheizten Drehherdofen[1996/50]
English:Method of reducing metal oxide in a rotary hearth furnace heated by an oxidizing flame[1996/50]
French:Procédé de réduction d'un oxyde métallique dans un four à sole rotatif, chauffé par une flamme oxydante[1999/32]
Former [1996/50]Procédé de réduction d'un oxyde métallique dans un four à sole rotatif, chauffé par un flamme
Examination procedure03.04.1997Examination requested  [1997/23]
10.09.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.01.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.06.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
10.08.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.10.1999Fee for grant paid
28.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.11.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.04.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
03.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0583164  (MINTEK [ZA]);
 [A]EP0508166  (ZIA METALLURG PROCESSES INC [US]);
 [A]EP0061815  (UNION CARBIDE CORP [US]);
 [A]US4386957  (FARMER AUDLEY J, et al);
 [AD]US4622905  (MACDOUGALL JOHN [US], et al);
 [A]FR2068831  (SHOWA DENKO KK) [A] 1 * page 7, line 5 - line 16; claim - *;
 [AD]US5186741  (KOTRABA NORMAN L [US], et al)