EP0734049 - Plasma mass spectrometry method and apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.05.2001 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.05.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.07.2001 [2001/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VARIAN AUSTRALIA PTY. LTD. 679-701 Springvale Road Mulgrave Victoria 3170 / AU | [N/P] |
Former [1996/39] | For all designated states VARIAN AUSTRALIA PTY. LTD. 679-701 Springvale Road Mulgrave, Victoria 3170 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Anderson, Stephen Esler 58 Moorhead Drive Mill Park, Victoria 3082 / AU | 02 /
Turner, Ian Lawrence 3 Grimwade Street Reservoir, Victoria 3073 / AU | [1996/39] | Representative(s) | Gordon, Michael Vincent GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | [1996/39] | Application number, filing date | 96108557.8 | 04.03.1994 | [1996/39] | Priority number, date | AU1993PL07643 | 05.03.1993 Original published format: AU PL764393 | [1996/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0734049 | Date: | 25.09.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0734049 | Date: | 27.12.1996 | [1996/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0734049 | Date: | 19.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.1996 | Classification | IPC: | H01J49/42, H01J49/10, H05H1/46 | [1996/50] | CPC: |
H05H1/0037 (EP,US);
H01J49/105 (EP,US);
H05H1/46 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1996/39] | H01J49/42 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/39] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Plasmamassenspektrometrie | [1996/39] | English: | Plasma mass spectrometry method and apparatus | [1996/39] | French: | Méthode et dispositif de spectrométrie de masse par plasma | [1996/39] | Examination procedure | 13.06.1997 | Examination requested [1997/33] | 30.07.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.02.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.01.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 27.03.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP94301573.5 / EP0614210 | Opposition(s) | 20.04.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4955717 (HENDERSON WILLIAM B [US]) [X] 1-6,8 * abstract * * column 4, line 37 - column 5, line 25 *; | [X]US4999492 (NAKAGAWA YOSHITOMO [JP]) [X] 1,33 * column 3, line 43 - column 4, line 53; figure 1 *; | [DA]EP0468742 (VARIAN AUSTRALIA [AU]) [DA] 1,6 * column 6, line 20 - line 37; figure 4 *; | [DA]JPS5873848 ; | [DA]US4501965 (DOUGLAS DONALD J [CA]) [DA] 1 * abstract *; | [DA]US3958883 (TURNER ARTHUR S) [DA] 1 * abstract *; | [DA]US4629940 (GAGNE PETER H [US], et al) [DA] 1 * abstract *; | [DA]US4682026 (DOUGLAS DONALD J [CA]) [DA] 1 * abstract * | [DA] - RUDOLPH R N ET AL, "PLASMA POLYMERIZATION AND A-C:H FILM ABLATION IN MICROWAVE DISCHARGES IN METHANE DILUTED WITH ARGON AND HYDROGEN", PLASMA CHEMISTRY AND PLASMA PROCESSING, (19900901), vol. 10, no. 3, pages 451 - 471, XP000150951 [DA] 1 * page 454, paragraphs 1-2; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF01447203 | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830723), vol. 007, no. 168, Database accession no. (P - 212), & JP58073848 A 19830504 (SHIMAZU SEISAKUSHO KK) [DA] 1 * abstract * |