Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0747393

EP0747393 - Thiazolo benzazepine containing dual action inhibitors [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.09.2001
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip14.09.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 31.10.2001 [2001/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bristol-Myers Squibb Company
Route 206 and Province Line Road
Princeton, NJ 08543 / US
[N/P]
Former [1996/50]For all designated states
BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY
P.O. Box 4000
Princeton, NJ 08543-4000 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Karanewsky, Donald S.
1797 Continental Lane
Escondido, CA 92029 / US
02 / Sun, Chong-Qing
527 Dutch Neck Road
East Windsor, NJ 08520 / US
[1996/50]
Representative(s)Josif, Albert , et al
Baaderstrasse 3
80469 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1996/50]Josif, Albert, Dr.-Ing. , et al
Baaderstrasse 3
80469 München / DE
Application number, filing date96108560.229.05.1996
[1996/50]
Priority number, dateUS1995048197607.06.1995         Original published format: US 481976
[1996/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0747393
Date:11.12.1996
Language:EN
[1996/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0747393
Date:08.11.2000
Language:EN
[2000/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP15.10.1996
ClassificationInternational:C07K5/06, A61K38/55
[1996/50]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1996/50]
TitleGerman:Thiazolobenzazepin-enthaltende Inhibitoren mit zweifacher Wirkung[1996/50]
English:Thiazolo benzazepine containing dual action inhibitors[1996/50]
French:Inhibiteurs à double action contenant le noyau de la thiazolo-benzazépine[1996/50]
Examination procedure07.02.1997Examination requested  [1997/15]
25.01.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
17.05.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.07.2000Fee for grant paid
19.07.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)09.08.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.05.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
12.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
15.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[T]EP0671172  (EISAI CO LTD [JP]) [T] 1-7 * column W *;
 [A]WO9428901  (EISAI CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-7;
 [T]EP0719779  (EISAI CO LTD [JP]) [T] 1-7 * column W *;
 [T]WO9602549  (EISAI CO LTD [JP], et al) [T] 1-7;
 ZA8507527  [ ] (MERCK & CO INC)
 [A]  - M J WYVRATT JR., "Bicyclic lactams as antihypertensive", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19870316), vol. 106, no. 11, Database accession no. 84620v, XP002015062 [A] 1-7 * abstract *