Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0747579

EP0747579 - Particulate trap for diesel engine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.06.2001
Database last updated on 20.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip29.06.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 16.08.2001 [2001/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES, LIMITED
5-33, Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku
Osaka 541 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1996/50]For all designated states
SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES, LIMITED
5-33, Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku
Osaka 541 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Nagai, Youichi, Itami Works
Sumitomo Elec. Ind., Ltd., 1-1, Koyakita 1-chome
Itami-shi, Hyogo / JP
02 / Ban, Shunsuke, Itami Works
Sumitomo Elec. Ind., Ltd., 1-1, Koyakita 1-chome
Itami-shi, Hyogo / JP
03 / Ihara, Tomohiko, Itami Works
Sumitomo Elec. Ind., Ltd., 1-1, Koyakita 1-chome
Itami-shi, Hyogo / JP
[1996/50]
Representative(s)Schieschke, Klaus , et al
Patentanwälte
Eder & Schieschke
Elisabethstrasse 34
80796 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/34]Schieschke, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte Eder & Schieschke Elisabethstrasse 34
80796 München / DE
Former [1996/50]Eder, Eugen, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwälte Eder & Schieschke Elisabethstrasse 34
80796 München / DE
Application number, filing date96108601.430.05.1996
[1996/50]
Priority number, dateJP1995013161130.05.1995         Original published format: JP 13161195
JP1995013194430.05.1995         Original published format: JP 13194495
JP1996009807319.04.1996         Original published format: JP 9807396
[1996/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0747579
Date:11.12.1996
Language:EN
[1996/50]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0747579
Date:26.03.1997
[1997/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0747579
Date:30.08.2000
Language:EN
[2000/35]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP10.02.1997
ClassificationInternational:F01N3/02, F01N3/28
[1996/50]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1996/50]
TitleGerman:Partikelfalle für einen Dieselmotor[1996/50]
English:Particulate trap for diesel engine[1996/50]
French:Piège des particules pour un moteur diesel[1996/50]
Examination procedure18.04.1997Examination requested  [1997/26]
15.07.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.11.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.04.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.08.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.10.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
19.11.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.02.2000Fee for grant paid
18.02.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP98122370.4  / EP0900922
Opposition(s)31.05.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.05.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
18.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
19.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP0626188  (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]) [Y] 1,11-13 * abstract *;
 [Y]JPS62149316  ;
 [DYA]EP0606071  (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]) [DY] 1,7,9 * figures 2,3; claims 1,4,9 * [A] 8;
 [A]EP0469277  (DIDIER WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 2 * column 2, line 5 - line 26; figure 1 *;
 [A]JPS6146216  ;
 [A]EP0501138  (DRACHE KERAMIKFILTER [DE]);
 [A]JPH04339120  ;
 [A]JPS5845715  ;
 [Y]JPS54110189
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19871210), vol. 11, no. 379, Database accession no. (C - 463), [Y] 1,9,11-13 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860716), vol. 10, no. 203, Database accession no. (C - 360), [A] 4,6 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930412), vol. 17, no. 186, Database accession no. (M - 1395), [A] * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830608), vol. 7, no. 131, Database accession no. (C - 169), [A] * abstract *
 [Y]  - 1, vol. 79, no. 41, Database accession no. 79-74038B, XP002023767 [Y] 7 * abstract *
ExaminationWO9802976