blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0745965

EP0745965 - A safe driving support system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.03.2004
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 27.08.2008  [2008/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kabushiki Kaisha Equos Research
2-19-2, Sotokanda
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo-to / JP
For all designated states
AISIN AW CO., LTD.
10, Takane Fujii-cho Anjo-shi
Aichi-ken / JP
[N/P]
Former [2003/20]For all designated states
Kabushiki Kaisha Equos Research
2-19-2, Sotokanda, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo-to / JP
For all designated states
AISIN AW CO., LTD.
10, Takane Fujii-cho
Anjo-shi Aichi-ken / JP
Former [1996/49]For all designated states
Kabushiki Kaisha Equos Research
2-19-2, Sotokanda, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo-to / JP
For all designated states
AISIN AW CO., LTD.
10, Takane Fujiicho
Anjo-shi Aichi-ken / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Yokoyama, Shoji
22-10, Kamiya 1-chome, Kita-ku
Tokyo-to, 115 / JP
02 / Suzuki, Seiichi
11-4, Higashishinkoiwa 1-chome, Katsushika-ku
Tokyo-to, 124 / JP
03 / Hori, Koji
15-16, Hakusan 1-chome, Bunkyo-ku
Tokyo-to, 113 / JP
04 / Miki, Nobuaki
47-3, Okino, Noda-cho
Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken, 448 / JP
05 / Kusafuka, Muneo
10-17, Sakura-cho
Anjo-shi, Aichi-ken, 446 / JP
06 / Murase, Yoshitaka
244-1, Inagumacho 8-chome
Okazaki-shi, Aichi-ken, 444 / JP
[1996/49]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Former [1996/49]VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date96108622.030.05.1996
[1996/49]
Priority number, dateJP1995015875802.06.1995         Original published format: JP 15875895
[1996/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0745965
Date:04.12.1996
Language:EN
[1996/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0745965
Date:14.05.2003
Language:EN
[2003/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.09.1996
ClassificationIPC:G08G1/0968, B60K31/00
[1996/49]
CPC:
B60K31/0058 (EP,US); B60W2556/50 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1996/49]
TitleGerman:Unterstützungssystem für vorsichtiges Fahren[1996/49]
English:A safe driving support system[1996/49]
French:Système d'aide pour conduite sans risque[1996/49]
Examination procedure18.10.1996Examination requested  [1996/51]
05.11.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.05.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.04.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.06.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.09.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.01.2003Fee for grant paid
30.01.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.02.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.05.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
28.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
30.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
31.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
31.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XA]WO9317406  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,3-11 * page 3, line 25 - page 4, line 2 * * page 6, line 20 - page 9, line 16; figure 1 * [A] 2;
 [XA]JPS62289433  ;
 [XA]US5315295  (FUJII YUTAKA [JP]) [X] 1,4-6,10,11 * abstract * [A] 2
 [XA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880526), vol. 012, no. 179, Database accession no. (M - 701), & JP62289433 A 19871216 (MAZDA MOTOR CORP) [X] 1,3,6,10,11 * abstract * [A] 2
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.