Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0749800

EP0749800 - Laser processing machine with beam guiding enclosure filled with gas [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  14.12.2007
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip14.12.2007Revocation of patentpublished on 16.01.2008  [2008/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Trumpf GmbH & Co
Johann-Maus-Strasse 2
71254 Ditzingen / DE
[N/P]
Former [1996/52]For all designated states
Trumpf GmbH & Co
Johann-Maus-Strasse 2
D-71254 Ditzingen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Möhler, Thomas
Ampfertal 2
71735 Eberdingen / DE
02 / Weick, Jürgen-Michael
Eberhardstrasse 17/3
71679 Asperg / DE
[1996/52]
Representative(s)Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Gropiusplatz 10
70563 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [1996/52]KOHLER SCHMID + PARTNER
Patentanwälte Ruppmannstrasse 27
70565 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date96108815.001.06.1996
[1996/52]
Priority number, dateDE1995209648U19.06.1995         Original published format: DE 29509648 U
[1996/52]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0749800
Date:27.12.1996
Language:DE
[1996/52]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0749800
Date:03.12.1997
[1997/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0749800
Date:19.03.2003
Language:DE
[2003/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.10.1997
ClassificationInternational:B23K26/12
[1996/52]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [1996/52]
TitleGerman:Laserbearbeitungsmaschine mit gasgefülltem Strahlführungsraum[1996/52]
English:Laser processing machine with beam guiding enclosure filled with gas[1996/52]
French:Machine d'usinage au laser, avec enceinte de guidage du faisceau remplie de gaz[1996/52]
Examination procedure17.12.1997Examination requested  [1998/09]
20.06.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.10.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.02.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.03.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.05.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
30.07.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.08.2002Fee for grant paid
22.08.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  02.09.2003   
L'AIR LIQUIDE, S.A. A DIRECTOIRE ET CONSEIL DE SURVEILLANCE POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION DES PROCEDES GEORGES CLAUDE
75 Quai d'Orsay
75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR
Opponent's representative
Pittis, Olivier
L'Air Liquide, S.A.
Direction de la Propriété Intellectuelle
75, Quai d'Orsay
75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR
 02  18.12.2003   
IHARA, Yoshiaki
Echu-jima 1-3-1-509, Kohto-ku
135-0044 TOKYO / JP
Opponent's representative
Klitzsch, Gottfried, et al
Grünecker Kinkeldey
Stockmair & Schwanhäusser
Anwaltssozietät
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2004/09]
Opponent(s)01  02.09.2003   
L'AIR LIQUIDE, S.A. A DIRECTOIRE ET CONSEIL DE SURVEILLANCE POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION DES PROCEDES GEORGES CLAUDE
75 Quai d'Orsay
75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR
Opponent's representative
Pittis, Olivier
L'Air Liquide, S.A., Direction de la Propriété Intellectuelle, 75, Quai d'Orsay
75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR
 02  18.12.2003   
IHARA, Yoshiaki
Echu-jima 1-3-1-509, Kohto-ku
135-0044 TOKYO / JP
Opponent's representative
Klitzsch, Gottfried, et al
Patentanwälte Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Partner Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Former [2003/45]
Opponent(s)01  02.09.2003   
L'AIR LIQUIDE, S.A. A DIRECTOIRE ET CONSEIL DE SURVEILLANCE POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION DES PROCEDES GEORGES CLAUDE
75 Quai d'Orsay
75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR
Opponent's representative
Pittis, Olivier
L'Air Liquide, S.A., Direction de la Propriété Intellectuelle, 75, Quai d'Orsay
75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR
10.02.2004Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
14.06.2004Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
08.03.2005Date of oral proceedings
14.04.2005Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
28.04.2005Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
18.10.2007Legal effect of revocation of patent [2008/03]
Appeal following opposition15.06.2005Appeal received No.  T0772/05
09.08.2005Statement of grounds filed
18.10.2007Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected
18.10.2007Date of oral proceedings
23.10.2007Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.05.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
15.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
12.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
12.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
15.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[X]US4895144  (COOK KENNETH P ET AL) [X] 1-11 * column 4, line 66 - column 5, line 42; figures 1,3 *;
 [X]US4550240  (TOIDA MASAHIRO ET AL) [X] 1,4,8-11 * column W *
ExaminationUS4661680
 DE4006148