Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0749182

EP0749182 - Electrical connector with terminal tail aligning device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.10.2002
Database last updated on 19.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip06.06.2003Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): DE
published on 23.07.2003  [2003/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MOLEX INCORPORATED
2222 Wellington Court
Lisle, Illinois 60532 / US
[N/P]
Former [1996/51]For all designated states
MOLEX INCORPORATED
2222 Wellington Court
Lisle Illinois 60532 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Nelson, Richard A.
2814 Miller Road
Geneva, IL 60134 / US
02 / Bixler, Craig A.
853 Chatham
Elmhurst, IL 60126 / US
03 / Landgraf, Glenn A.
12 So. Loomis Street
Naperville, IL 60540 / US
[1996/51]
Representative(s)Blumbach · Zinngrebe Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
PatentConsult
Alexandrastraße 5
65187 Wiesbaden / DE
[N/P]
Former [1996/51]Blumbach, Kramer & Partner
Patentanwälte, Sonnenberger Strasse 100
65193 Wiesbaden / DE
Application number, filing date96108902.604.06.1996
[1996/51]
Priority number, dateUS1995049050214.06.1995         Original published format: US 490502
[1996/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0749182
Date:18.12.1996
Language:EN
[1996/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0749182
Date:19.12.2001
Language:EN
[2001/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.10.1996
ClassificationInternational:H01R12/18, H01R12/20
[2000/24]
Former International [1996/51]H01R23/70
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1996/51]
TitleGerman:Elektrischer Verbinder mit Ausrichtungsvorrichtung für Anschlussenden[1996/51]
English:Electrical connector with terminal tail aligning device[1996/51]
French:Connecteur électrique ayant un dispositif d'alignement des extrémités des bornes[1996/51]
Examination procedure24.05.1997Examination requested  [1997/31]
07.05.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.09.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.03.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.09.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.09.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
26.01.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.04.2001Fee for grant paid
06.04.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.09.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
04.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
05.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
05.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipDE20.03.2002
GB04.06.2002
[2003/30]
Former [2003/17]GB04.06.2002
Documents cited:Search[X]GB2095485  (ITT) [X] 1,7 * page 1, line 41 - line 62 * * page 1, line 118 - line 125 * * page 2, line 11 - line 35; figures 2,3 *;
 [A]EP0639873  (SUMITOMO WIRING SYSTEMS [JP]) [A] 1,3-5,7 * column 1, line 23 - line 38; figures 5,6 *;
 [A]EP0335160  (HARTING ELEKTRONIK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,7 * column 3, line 57 - column 4, line 2; figure 2 *;
 [A]EP0635912  (MOLEX INC [US]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 41 - line 49; figure 2 *