Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0747171

EP0747171 - Method and apparatus for knife and blade sharpening [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.12.2000
Database last updated on 22.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip11.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 13.08.2008  [2008/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
EDGECRAFT CORPORATION
Avondale, Pennsylvania / US
[1999/24]
Former [1996/50]For all designated states
EDGECRAFT CORPORATION
Limestone and Southwood Roads
Avondale, PA 19311 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Friel, Daniel D.
Windward Road, P.O.Box 4319
Greenville, DE 19807 / US
[1996/50]
Representative(s)Wagner, Karl H.
Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/33]Wagner, Karl H.
Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
Former [1996/50]Wagner, Karl H., Dipl.-Ing.
WAGNER & GEYER Patentanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date96108960.404.06.1996
[1996/50]
Priority number, dateUS1995046645106.06.1995         Original published format: US 466451
[1996/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0747171
Date:11.12.1996
Language:EN
[1996/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0747171
Date:02.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.10.1996
ClassificationInternational:B24D15/08, B24D15/06
[1996/50]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL,   SE [1996/50]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Schärfen von Messern und Klingen[1996/50]
English:Method and apparatus for knife and blade sharpening[1996/50]
French:Procédé et dispositif pour affûter des couteaux et des lames[1996/50]
Examination procedure09.06.1997Examination requested  [1997/33]
29.04.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
23.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.11.1999Fee for grant paid
02.11.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.11.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.05.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
21.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[A]GB191315053  (HAYWOOD EDMUND BURKE [US]) [A] 1,6,10 * & GB-A-15053 A.D. 1913;; figure -; claim 1 *;
 [A]FR579701  (ANTOINE-GEORGES BONNET) [A] 1,6,10 * abstract *;
 [A]GB512326  (ALFRED ERNEST JAFFA) [A] 2,3 * page 3, line 102 - line 111; figure 6 *;
 [A]US4280378  (LEVINE ABRAHAM I) [A] 5 * column A; figure 1 *