blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0747647

EP0747647 - Vertical type calcination kiln [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  31.01.2003
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip31.01.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 19.03.2003  [2003/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Chisaki Co., Ltd.
No. 18-7 Higashi-Ikebukuro 2-chome, Toshima-ku
Tokyo / JP
For all designated states
Kunii, Daizo
No. 25-16, Nakamachi 1-chome, Meguro-ku
Tokyo / JP
[1996/50]
Inventor(s)01 / Chisaki, Tatsu
21-25-701, Namiki 1-chome
Kawaguchi-shi, Saitama / JP
02 / Kunii, Daizo
No. 25-16, Nakamachi 1-chome
Meguro-ku, Tokyo / JP
[1996/50]
Representative(s)Popp, Eugen, et al
Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte
Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Widenmayerstrasse 47
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1996/50]Popp, Eugen, Dr., et al
MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER Widenmayerstrasse 48
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date96109060.205.06.1996
[1996/50]
Priority number, dateJP1995016712309.06.1995         Original published format: JP 16712395
[1996/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0747647
Date:11.12.1996
Language:EN
[1996/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0747647
Date:27.03.2002
Language:EN
[2002/13]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.10.1996
ClassificationIPC:F27B1/00, F27B9/16, F27D3/00, C04B2/10
[1996/50]
CPC:
F27B1/20 (EP,US); F27B1/005 (EP,US); F27D2099/008 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   NL [1996/50]
TitleGerman:Kalzinierschachtsofen[1996/50]
English:Vertical type calcination kiln[1996/50]
French:Four de calcination vertical[1996/50]
Examination procedure16.04.1997Examination requested  [1997/24]
01.09.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.12.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.08.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.12.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.05.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
05.09.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.12.2001Fee for grant paid
17.12.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)30.12.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2003/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
28.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
29.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
26.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]DE296155  (G.POLYSIUS);
 [A]JPH07116498  ;
 [Y]US2945687  (JOHN DAVIS GEOFFREY GEORGE) [Y] 1,2 * figure -; claim - *;
 [A]EP0001814  (BABCOCK KRAUSS MAFFEI IND [DE]) [A] 4 * Abstract ; fig 1*;
 [Y]DE4300235  (HOELTJE WILLI DIPL ING [DE]) [Y] 1,2 * figure -; claim - *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 95, no. 5, & JP7116498 A 19950509 (CHIS-N) [A] * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.