EP0741199 - Automatic cop changing device for a weaving machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.2001 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.06.2001 [2001/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPPON FELT CO., LTD. 27-12, 8-chome, Toshima Kita-ku Tokyo / JP | [1996/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Murakami, Fumio 1-122 Nishitakao Kitamoto-shi, Saima-ken / JP | 02 /
Okazaki, Sadaaki 2-19-3 Shinden, Adachi-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Aoyagi, Takayoshi 1028-148 Shiranecho, Asahi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 04 /
Konno, Tetsuya, Chiyoda Kakou Kensetsu K.K. Kamihoshikawaryou, 63-2 Higashikawashimacho Hodogaya-ku, Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 05 /
Iwasaki, Tokuji 2-11-7-103 Maihama Urayasu-shi, Chiba-ken / JP | [1996/51] |
Former [1996/45] | 01 /
Murakami, Fumio 1-222 Nishitakao Kitamoto-shi, Saima-ken / JP | ||
02 /
Okazaki, Sadaaki 2-19-3 Shinden, Adachi-ku Tokyo / JP | |||
03 /
Aoyagi, Takayoshi 1028-148 Shiranecho, Asahi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | |||
04 /
Konno, Tetsuya, Chiyoda Kakou Kensetsu K.K. Kamihoshikawaryou, 63-2 Higashikawashimacho Hodogaya-ku, Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | |||
05 /
Iwasaki, Tokuji 2-11-7-103 Maihama Urayasu-shi, Chiba-ken / JP | Representative(s) | Wharton, Peter Robert Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/45] | Wharton, Peter Robert Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Inventions House Valley Court, Canal Road Bradford BD1 4SP / GB | Application number, filing date | 96109170.9 | 01.12.1989 | [1996/45] | Priority number, date | JP19880309598 | 07.12.1988 Original published format: JP 30959888 | JP19880309599 | 07.12.1988 Original published format: JP 30959988 | [1996/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0741199 | Date: | 06.11.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0741199 | Date: | 05.03.1997 | [1997/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0741199 | Date: | 28.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.1997 | Classification | IPC: | D03D45/20 | [1996/45] | CPC: |
D03D45/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT, SE [1996/45] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum selbststätigen Auswechseln der Schussfadenspule an einem Webstuhl | [1996/45] | English: | Automatic cop changing device for a weaving machine | [1996/45] | French: | Dispositif de changement automatique de canette pour métier à tisser | [1996/45] | Examination procedure | 26.06.1996 | Examination requested [1996/45] | 25.08.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.11.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.12.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 22.03.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP89312561.7 / EP0372856 | EP94201080.2 / EP0613969 | Opposition(s) | 29.03.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 17.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB936286 (RUETI AG MASCHF); | [YDA]US3608589 (TAYLOR BENJAMIN BERT) [YD] 1,3,16 * column 3, line 52 - column 4, line 44; figure - * [A] 5; | [Y]US4486928 (TUCKER THOMAS L [US], et al) [Y] 1,3,16 * figure 1 *; | [PA]EP0295700 (ICHIKAWA WOOLEN TEXTILE [JP], et al) [PA] 1 * the whole document * |