Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0748645

EP0748645 - METHOD USING A ROTATING FILTER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1996/51]Rotating filter
[1999/39]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.06.2001
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip19.09.2008Change - representativepublished on 22.10.2008  [2008/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NYFOTEK A.S.
Strindveien 4
7034 Trondheim / NO
[1997/28]
Former [1996/51]For all designated states
Lundin, Eric Gustaf
Grimnäs
840 50 Gällö / SE
Inventor(s)01 / Lundin, Eric Gustaf
Grimäs
840 50 Gällö / SE
[1997/28]
Former [1996/51]01 / see applicant
...
Representative(s)Tomerius, Isabel , et al
Lang & Tomerius
Patentanwälte
Rosa-Bavarese-Strasse 5
80639 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/43]Tomerius, Isabel , et al
Lang & Tomerius Patentanwälte Landsberger Strasse 300
80687 München / DE
Former [2000/30]Tomerius, Isabel , et al
Patentanwälte Weber & Heim Bavariaring 29
80336 München / DE
Former [2000/02]Tomerius, Isabel, Dr. Dipl.-Chem. , et al
Patentanwälte Weber & Heim, Irmgardstrasse 3
81479 München / DE
Former [1996/51]Weber, Otto Ernst, Dipl.-Phys. , et al
Weber & Heim Irmgardstrasse 3
81479 München / DE
Application number, filing date96109261.610.06.1996
[1996/51]
Priority number, dateDE199512196316.06.1995         Original published format: DE 19521963
[1996/51]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0748645
Date:18.12.1996
Language:DE
[1996/51]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0748645
Date:02.04.1997
[1997/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0748645
Date:16.08.2000
Language:DE
[2000/33]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.02.1997
ClassificationInternational:B01D33/073, B01D33/72
[1996/51]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1996/51]
Extension statesSI08.07.1996
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG EINES ROTIERENDEN FILTERS[1999/39]
English:METHOD USING A ROTATING FILTER[1999/39]
French:PROCEDE D'UTILISATION D' UN FILTRE ROTATIF[1999/39]
Former [1996/51]Rotierendes Filter
Former [1996/51]Rotating filter
Former [1996/51]Filtre rotatif
Examination procedure27.08.1997Examination requested  [1997/43]
23.12.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.02.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.05.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.07.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.10.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
20.12.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.01.2000Fee for grant paid
07.01.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.05.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
30.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
23.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI16.08.2000
NL16.08.2000
SE16.08.2000
DK16.11.2000
PT16.11.2000
GR17.11.2000
IE19.04.2001
[2004/51]
Former [2003/46]FI16.08.2000
NL16.08.2000
SE16.08.2000
DK16.11.2000
PT16.11.2000
IE19.04.2001
Former [2003/31]FI16.08.2000
NL16.08.2000
SE16.08.2000
PT16.11.2000
IE19.04.2001
Former [2003/09]FI16.08.2000
NL16.08.2000
PT16.11.2000
IE19.04.2001
Former [2002/10]FI16.08.2000
PT16.11.2000
IE19.04.2001
Former [2001/50]FI16.08.2000
IE16.08.2000
PT16.11.2000
Former [2001/29]FI16.08.2000
PT16.11.2000
Former [2001/18]PT16.11.2000
Documents cited:Search[X]US3443696  (SCHUTTE AUGUST H) [X] 1-3,5,6,8-12 * column 3, line 42 - line 62; figure 1 * * column 4, line 61 - line 75 *;
 [X]US3152078  (LAVANCHY ANDRE C) [X] 1-3,9-12 * figure 1 *;
 [X]US3392114  (DELCELLIER HENRI A) [X] 1-3,5,9-12 * figure 6 *;
 [A]WO9007968  (COCA COLA CO [US]) [A] 1 * figures 1-7 *