Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0748927

EP0748927 - A device for determining deterioration of a catalytic converter for an engine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.02.2002
Database last updated on 20.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip08.02.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.03.2002  [2002/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha
1 Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi
Aichi-ken / JP
[N/P]
Former [1996/51]For all designated states
TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi
Aichi-ken / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Mitsutani, Noritake, c/o Toyota Jidosha K.K.
1, Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi, Aichi / JP
02 / Adachi, Shin, c/o Toyota Jidosha K.K.
1, Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi, Aichi / JP
[1996/51]
Representative(s)Tiedtke, Harro
Patentanwaltsbüro
Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner
Bavariaring 4
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1996/51]Tiedtke, Harro, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date96109329.111.06.1996
[1996/51]
Priority number, dateJP1995014469012.06.1995         Original published format: JP 14469095
JP1995019152727.07.1995         Original published format: JP 19152795
JP1996005589113.03.1996         Original published format: JP 5589196
[1996/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0748927
Date:18.12.1996
Language:EN
[1996/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0748927
Date:04.04.2001
Language:EN
[2001/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.10.1996
ClassificationInternational:F01N7/00, F02D41/14
[1996/51]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1996/51]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zum Feststellen der Verschlechterung eines Katalysators einer Brennkraftmaschine[2000/27]
English:A device for determining deterioration of a catalytic converter for an engine[1996/51]
French:Dispositif pour déterminer la détérioration d'un catalyseur d'un moteur à combustion interne[1996/51]
Former [1996/51]Vorrichtung zum Feststellen der Verslechterung eines Katalysators einer Brennkraftmaschine
Examination procedure11.06.1996Examination requested  [1996/51]
30.03.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.08.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.06.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
09.10.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.01.2001Fee for grant paid
09.01.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.01.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
14.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
13.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]US5381657  (TAKIZAWA TSUYOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 7, line 61 - column 8, line 60 * * column 11, line 65 - column 12, line 39; figure -; claims 1,13-16 *;
 [A]US5337555  (TOKUDA SHOJI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 5, line 62 - column 6, line 43 * * column 10, line 47 - line 63; figure - *;
 [A]US5412941  (SUZUKI KATSUHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 15, line 49 - line 60; figure 13 *;
 [A]US5351484  (WADE WALLACE R [US]) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 2, line 59 - column 3, line 5; figure - *;
 [A]US5386693  (ORZEL DANIEL V [US])