Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0748682

EP0748682 - Roller head extruder having a sheet width adjusting apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1996/51]Sheet width adjusting apparatus for rolling head extruder
[1999/11]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.11.2000
Database last updated on 20.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 03.01.2001 [2001/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KABUSHIKI KAISHA KOBE SEIKO SHO also known as Kobe Steel Ltd.
3-18, Wakinohama-cho 1 chome, Chuo-ku
Kobe 651 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1996/51]For all designated states
KABUSHIKI KAISHA KOBE SEIKO SHO also known as Kobe Steel Ltd.
3-18, Wakinohama-cho 1 chome, Chuo-ku
Kobe 651 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Nakano, Hiromi, c/o Takasago Works Kobe Steel Ltd.
3-1, Shinhama 2-chome, Arai-cho
Takasago-shi, Hyogo, 676 / JP
[1996/51]
Representative(s)Tiedtke, Harro
Patentanwaltsbüro
Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner
Bavariaring 4
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1996/51]Tiedtke, Harro, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date96109570.013.06.1996
[1996/51]
Priority number, dateJP1995015041716.06.1995         Original published format: JP 15041795
[1996/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0748682
Date:18.12.1996
Language:EN
[1996/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0748682
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.09.1996
ClassificationInternational:B29C47/32, B29C47/16
[1996/51]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1996/51]
TitleGerman:Walzenextruder mit Schichtbreiteneinstelleinrichtung[1999/11]
English:Roller head extruder having a sheet width adjusting apparatus[1999/11]
French:Extrudeuse à rouleaux avec dispositif pour ajuster la largeur de la feuille[1999/11]
Former [1996/51]Schichtbreiteneinstelleinrichtung für Extrusionsdüse mit Walze
Former [1996/51]Sheet width adjusting apparatus for rolling head extruder
Former [1996/51]Dispositif pour ajuster la largeur d'une feuille, pour une filière d'extrusion à rouleau
Examination procedure13.06.1996Examination requested  [1996/51]
30.09.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.01.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
23.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.10.1999Fee for grant paid
25.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
23.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[A]DE3338117  (BERSTORFF GMBH MASCH HERMANN [DE]) [A] 1,2,6 * abstract * * claims 1,5 * * page 6, line 15 - line 21 * * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]EP0087041  (DEERE & CO [US]) [A] 1,3-5 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE3637358  (HERMANN BERSTOFF MASCHB GMBH) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE3508547  (UNIROYAL ENGLEBERT GMBH [DE]) [A] 3-6 * abstract * * claims 1,2 * * page 4, line 24 - line 35 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]US4354814  (GRIMMINGER ALBERT, et al) [A] 1 * column 4, line 32 - line 39 * * figures 2,3 *