Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0751466

EP0751466 - Multiprocessor system with a very large number of microprocessors [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.12.2003
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.06.2008Change - representativepublished on 23.07.2008  [2008/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fujitsu Siemens Computers GmbH
Otto-Hahn-Ring 6
81739 München / DE
[2001/01]
Former [1997/01]For all designated states
Siemens Nixdorf Informationssysteme AG
Heinz-Nixdorf-Ring 1
33106 Paderborn / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Sachs, Harald
Eichenstrasse 44
85649 Brunnthal / DE
02 / Kock, Jürgen
Oskar-Maria-Graf-Strasse 5
85667 Grafing / DE
[1997/01]
Representative(s)Epping - Hermann - Fischer
Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Schlossschmidstrasse 5
80639 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/30]Epping - Hermann - Fischer
Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Ridlerstrasse 55
80339 München / DE
Former [2004/04]Epping, Hermann, Fischer
Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Ridlerstrasse 55
80339 München / DE
Former [2000/46]Epping, Wilhelm, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Epping Hermann & Fischer Postfach 12 10 26
80034 München / DE
Former [1998/22]Epping, Wilhelm, Dr.-Ing.
Patentanwalt Postfach 22 13 17
80503 München / DE
Former [1997/01]Fuchs, Franz-Josef, Dr.-Ing. , et al
Postfach 22 13 17
80503 München / DE
Application number, filing date96109754.017.06.1996
[1997/01]
Priority number, dateDE199512402330.06.1995         Original published format: DE 19524023
[1997/01]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0751466
Date:02.01.1997
Language:DE
[1997/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0751466
Date:18.03.1998
[1998/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0751466
Date:05.02.2003
Language:DE
[2003/06]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.01.1998
ClassificationInternational:G06F15/173, G06F12/08
[1998/12]
Former International [1997/01]G06F15/173
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1997/01]
TitleGerman:Multiprozessorsystem mit einer sehr grossen Anzahl von Mikroprozessoren[1997/01]
English:Multiprocessor system with a very large number of microprocessors[1997/01]
French:Système multiprocesseur avec un très grand nombre de microprocesseurs[1997/01]
Examination procedure07.09.1998Examination requested  [1998/45]
28.03.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.10.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.07.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.11.2002Fee for grant paid
15.11.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.11.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2004/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
18.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
19.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
06.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
24.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT05.02.2003
[2008/06]
Documents cited:Search[YA]EP0587918  (SIEMENS NIXDORF INF SYST [DE]) [Y] 1,2 * the whole document * [A] 3-5;
 [YA]EP0603801  (BULL HN INFORMATION SYST [US]) [Y] 1,2 * page 3, line 34 - line 44 * * page 4, line 6 - page 5, line 49; figure 2 * [A] 3-5;
 [A]US5249283  (BOLAND VERNON K [US]) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *;
 [A]  - LENOSKI D ET AL, "THE STANFORD DASH MULTIPROCESSOR", COMPUTER, (19920301), vol. 25, no. 3, pages 63 - 79, XP000288291 [A] 1-5 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/2.121510
 [A]  - FEITOSA R Q, "CACHEKOHARENZ-PROBLEM BEI GROSSEN MULTIPROZESSOREN FUR NUMERISCHE ANWENDUNGEN: EIN NEUER LOSUNGSVORSCHLAG", ANGEWANDTE INFORMATIK. APPLIED INFORMATICS, (19891101), vol. 31, no. 11/12, pages 532 - 541, XP000099627 [A] 1 * page 534, column L, line 40 - column R, line 4 *