Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0750165

EP0750165 - Thermal insulation compound system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.07.2003
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.09.2008Change - representativepublished on 08.10.2008  [2008/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
STO AG
79780 Stühlingen / DE
[1996/52]
Inventor(s)01 / Grochal, Peter, Dr.
Bloisstr. 90
79761 Waldshut-Tiengen / DE
[1996/52]
Representative(s)Leinweber & Zimmermann
European Patent Attorneys
Patentanwälte
Viktualienmarkt 8
80331 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/41]Leinweber & Zimmermann
European Patent Attorneys Patentanwälte Rosental 7
80331 München / DE
Former [1996/52]Patentanwälte Leinweber & Zimmermann
Rosental 7
80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date96109788.818.06.1996
[1996/52]
Priority number, dateDE1995102217019.06.1995         Original published format: DE 19522170
[1996/52]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0750165
Date:27.12.1996
Language:DE
[1996/52]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0750165
Date:03.12.1997
[1997/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0750165
Date:04.09.2002
Language:DE
[2002/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.10.1997
ClassificationInternational:F24J2/04
[1996/52]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1996/52]
TitleGerman:Wärmedämmverbundsystem[1996/52]
English:Thermal insulation compound system[1996/52]
French:Système composite pour isolation thermique[1996/52]
Examination procedure12.02.1998Examination requested  [1998/15]
10.12.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07)
11.07.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.12.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.03.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.10.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
07.03.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.05.2002Fee for grant paid
16.05.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
30.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
29.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
28.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
28.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR04.09.2002
GB04.09.2002
GR04.09.2002
IE04.09.2002
IT04.09.2002
NL04.09.2002
DK04.12.2002
SE04.12.2002
ES28.03.2003
[2008/06]
Former [2007/16]FR04.09.2002
GB04.09.2002
GR04.09.2002
IE04.09.2002
NL04.09.2002
DK04.12.2002
SE04.12.2002
ES28.03.2003
Former [2006/14]FR04.09.2002
GB04.09.2002
GR04.09.2002
IE04.09.2002
NL04.09.2002
SE04.12.2002
ES28.03.2003
Former [2004/21]GB04.09.2002
GR04.09.2002
IE04.09.2002
NL04.09.2002
SE04.12.2002
ES28.03.2003
Former [2004/04]GR04.09.2002
IE04.09.2002
NL04.09.2002
SE04.12.2002
ES28.03.2003
Former [2003/42]GR04.09.2002
IE04.09.2002
NL04.09.2002
SE04.12.2002
Former [2003/22]GR04.09.2002
NL04.09.2002
SE04.12.2002
Former [2003/20]GR04.09.2002
SE04.12.2002
Former [2003/14]SE04.12.2002
Documents cited:Search[YA]EP0333145  (STO AG [DE]) [Y] 1 * page 3, line 28 - page 4, line 42; figure 1 * [A] 2-9;
 [Y]EP0038397  (MOELVEN BRUG AS [NO]) [Y] 1 * page 2, line 1 - page 3, line 10; figures 2,5 *;
 [A]FR2350559  (SUNLIFE SPA [IT]) [A] 1-9 * page 6, line 28 - page 7, line 5; figure 3 *;
 [A]DE3008610  (IDUSO GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-9 * page 4, line 23 - page 4, line 29; figures 1-3 *
by applicantEP0590625
 DE3141931
 DE4301863