Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0750238

EP0750238 - Integrated ground collision avoidance system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  05.09.2003
Database last updated on 18.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip23.10.2009Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representativepublished on 25.11.2009  [2009/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HONEYWELL INC.
Honeywell Plaza
Minneapolis, MN 55408 / US
[N/P]
Former [1996/52]For all designated states
HONEYWELL INC.
Honeywell Plaza
Minneapolis Minnesota 55408 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Tran, My
5404 Chelwood Park Boulevard, N.E.
Albuquerque, NM 87111 / US
[1996/52]
Representative(s)Rentzsch, Heinz , et al
Honeywell Holding AG Patent- und Lizenzabteilung Postfach 10 08 65
63008 Offenbach / DE
[2009/29]
Former [1996/52]Rentzsch, Heinz, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Honeywell Holding AG, Patent- und Lizenzabteilung, Kaiserleistrasse 39
63067 Offenbach / DE
Application number, filing date96109900.920.06.1996
[1996/52]
Priority number, dateUS1995049322520.06.1995         Original published format: US 493225
[1996/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0750238
Date:27.12.1996
Language:EN
[1996/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0750238
Date:01.03.2000
Language:EN
[2000/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.10.1996
ClassificationInternational:G05D1/06, G08G5/04, G01C21/00
[1996/52]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1996/52]
TitleGerman:Integriertes System zur Grundkollisionsvermeidung[1996/52]
English:Integrated ground collision avoidance system[1996/52]
French:Système intégré d'anti-collision avec le sol[1996/52]
Examination procedure03.06.1997Examination requested  [1997/31]
20.08.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
06.09.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.09.1999Fee for grant paid
09.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  01.12.2000  20.12.2000  ADMISSIBLE
BAE SYSTEMS PLC
Lancaster House, P.O Box 87 Farnborough Aerospace Centre
Farnborough, Hampshire GU 14 GYU / GB
Opponent's representative
Popp, Eugen
Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte
Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Postfach 86 06 24
81633 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2009/48]
Opponent(s)01  01.12.2000  20.12.2000  ADMISSIBLE
BAE SYSTEMS PLC
Lancaster House, P.O Box 87 Farnborough Aerospace Centre
Farnborough, Hampshire GU 14 GYU / GB
Opponent's representative
Popp, Eugen
Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24
81633 München / DE
Former [2001/04]
Opponent(s)01  01.12.2000   
BAE SYSTEMS PLC
Lancaster House, P.O Box 87 Farnborough Aerospace Centre
Farnborough, Hampshire GU 14 GYU / GB
Opponent's representative
Popp, Eugen, Dr.
MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER Postfach 86 06 24
81633 München / DE
12.01.2001Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
16.05.2001Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
21.05.2003Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
31.05.2003Legal effect of revocation of patent [2003/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.03.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
04.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR28.02.2002
DE03.04.2002
GB20.06.2002
[2004/21]
Former [2003/32]FR28.02.2002
DE03.04.2002
Former [2003/30]DE03.04.2002
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP0565399  (DASSAULT ELECTRONIQUE [FR]) [X] 1,6,16 * the whole document * [Y] 7,8,10,17;
 [A]EP0597760  (SEXTANT AVIONIQUE [FR]) [A] 1,7,16 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE4327706  (DEUTSCHE AEROSPACE AIRBUS [DE]) [A] 1,7,16 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0609162  (ISRAEL STATE [IL]) [A] 1,7,16 * the whole document *
 [Y]  CHENG V H L, "CONCEPT DEVELOPMENT OF AUTOMATIC GUIDANCE FOR ROTORCRAFT OBSTACLE AVOIDANCE", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ROBOTICS AND AUTOMATION, (19900401), vol. 6, no. 2, pages 252 - 257, XP000170539 [Y] 7,8,10,17 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/70.54741