Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0758572

EP0758572 - Method for removing layers of material from a surface of a workpiece [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.09.2001
Database last updated on 19.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip04.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 06.02.2008  [2008/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
OT Oberflächentechnik GmbH Schwerin
Werkstrasse 4
19061 Schwerin / DE
[1997/08]
Inventor(s)01 / Pauls, Carsten
Spandauer Str. 22
40599 Düsseldorf / DE
[1997/08]
Representative(s)Ostertag, Ulrich , et al
Ostertag & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Epplestrasse 14
70597 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [1997/08]Ostertag, Ulrich , et al
Patentanwälte Dr. Ulrich Ostertag Dr. Reinhard Ostertag Eibenweg 10
70597 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date96110555.829.06.1996
[1997/08]
Priority number, dateDE199512974912.08.1995         Original published format: DE 19529749
[1997/08]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0758572
Date:19.02.1997
Language:DE
[1997/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0758572
Date:15.11.2000
Language:DE
[2000/46]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.11.1996
ClassificationInternational:B24C1/04, B24C3/18, B24C11/00, B26D7/08, B23Q1/54
[1997/08]
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1997/08]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum schichtweisen Abtragen von Material von der Oberfläche eines Werkstücks[1997/08]
English:Method for removing layers of material from a surface of a workpiece[1997/08]
French:Procédé pour enlever des couches de matériaux de la surface d'une pièce[1997/08]
Examination procedure10.02.1997Examination requested  [1997/16]
15.10.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.04.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.02.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
18.04.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.05.2000Fee for grant paid
06.05.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.08.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
22.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
23.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR15.11.2000
GB15.11.2000
IT15.11.2000
NL15.11.2000
SE15.02.2001
AT29.06.2001
CH30.06.2001
LI30.06.2001
[2008/06]
Former [2006/14]FR15.11.2000
GB15.11.2000
NL15.11.2000
SE15.02.2001
AT29.06.2001
CH30.06.2001
LI30.06.2001
Former [2003/10]GB15.11.2000
NL15.11.2000
SE15.02.2001
FR13.04.2001
AT29.06.2001
CH30.06.2001
LI30.06.2001
Former [2003/09]GB15.11.2000
NL15.11.2000
SE15.02.2001
FR13.04.2001
CH30.06.2001
LI30.06.2001
Former [2003/01]GB15.11.2000
SE15.02.2001
FR13.04.2001
CH30.06.2001
LI30.06.2001
Former [2002/12]GB15.11.2000
SE15.02.2001
FR13.04.2001
Former [2002/10]SE15.02.2001
FR13.04.2001
Former [2001/51]SE15.02.2001
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP0400758  (FLOW INT CORP [US]) [X] 1-4,8,11-14 * column A * * column 7, lines 31-36; figure 7 * [Y] 9,18,19;
 [Y]US3447985  (SEITZ RUSSELL) [Y] 9,18,19 * column 2, lines 9-48; figure . *;
 [A]GB2236065  (SUBOCEAN PROJECTS & EQUIPMENT [GB]) [A] 5-7 * the whole document *;
 [A]GB1395426  (WESTERN ELECTRIC CO) [A] 9,18 * the whole document *;
 [A]GB2256612  (BURLINGTON SLATE LIMITED [GB]) [A] 10 * page 2, lines 7-11 *;
 [A]EP0477070  (SAINT GOBAIN VITRAGE [FR]) [A] 16 * column A; figure 1 *;
 [A]US5423713  (MISHIMA AKIO [JP]) [A] 17 * column 3, lines 36-49; figure 3 *;
 [A]JPH0475332  ;
 [A]WO9213679  (CA NAT RESEARCH COUNCIL [CA]);
 [A]WO9514552  (BATTELLE MEMORIAL INSTITUTE [CH], et al)
 [A]  - "WASSER SCHNEIDET GLAS", SPRECHSAAL, (19900901), vol. 123, no. 9, page 864, 867, XP000174750 [A] 1,11,15
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 016, no. 291, [A] 20 * abstract *