blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0788921


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
05.10.2001 No opposition filed within time limit published on  21.11.2001 [2001/47]
13.10.2000 (Expected) grant published on  29.11.2000 [2000/48]
28.07.2000 Communication of intention to grant a patent
21.06.2000 Renewal fee
30.05.2000 Communication of intention to grant
30.05.2000 Communication of intention to grant a patent
11.02.2000 First examination report
07.02.2000 Communication of intention to grant
30.07.1999 Renewal fee
19.02.1999 Change - applicant published on  07.04.1999 [1999/14]
31.07.1998 Renewal fee
22.05.1998 Request for examination filed published on  08.07.1998 [1998/28]
09.04.1998 Publication of search report published on  27.05.1998 [1998/22]
03.04.1998 Change - classification published on  20.05.1998 [1998/21]
04.07.1997 Change - applicant published on  20.08.1997 [1997/34]
27.06.1997 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  13.08.1997 [1997/33]