blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0788921
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE59606168D 04.01.2001D1
Priority number Date
DE59606168 01.07.1996
DE19531734 29.08.1995
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0788921Global Dossier 29.11.2000B1
EP0788921 27.05.1998A3
EP0788921 13.08.1997A2
Priority number Date
DE19531734 29.08.1995
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE19531734 10.09.1998C2
DE19531734 06.03.1997A1
Priority number Date
DE19531734 29.08.1995
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US5761967 09.06.1998A
Priority number Date
DE19531734 29.08.1995