blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0788921

Designated contracting states DE 
 FR 
 GB 
 IT 
Examination procedure19.07.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.07.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
17.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
14.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
European patent granted29.11.2000
Opposition procedure30.08.2001No opposition filed within time limit published on 21.11.2001 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:13.08.1997 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A2
Designated State(s):DE FR GB IT
 
Event date:20.08.1997 
Event description:RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED
Owner Name:DAIMLER-BENZ AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
 
Event date:27.05.1998 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A3
Designated State(s):DE FR GB IT
 
Event date:08.07.1998 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:19980509
 
Event date:07.04.1999 
Event description:RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED
Owner Name:DAIMLERCHRYSLER AG
 
Event date:29.03.2000 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20000210
 
Event date:06.11.2000 
Event description:IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED
Owner Name:BARZANO' E ZANARDO ROMA S.P.A.
 
Event date:29.11.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):DE FR GB IT
 
Event date:03.01.2001 
Event description:GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)
Effective DATE:20001211
 
Event date:04.01.2001 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:59606168
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20010104
Format of Ref Document F/P:P
 
Event date:12.01.2001 
Event description:FR: TRANSLATION FILED
 
Event date:21.11.2001 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
 
Event date:01.01.2002 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB IF02
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01
 
Event date:11.07.2002 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20020711
Year of Fee Payment:07
 
Event date:04.07.2003 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20030704
Year of Fee Payment:08
 
Event date:11.07.2003 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20030711
Year of Fee Payment:08
 
Event date:23.07.2003 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF THE APPLICANT RENOUNCES
Effective DATE:20030723
 
Event date:01.07.2004 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20040701
 
Event date:23.02.2005 
Event description:GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE
Effective DATE:20040701
 
Event date:31.03.2005 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20050331
 
Event date:29.04.2005 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR ST
Code Expl.:-NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE
 
Event date:01.07.2005 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20050701