Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0788921

EP0788921 - Support frame for an accelerator pedal of motor vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.10.2001
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 21.11.2001 [2001/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DaimlerChrysler AG
Epplestrasse 225
70567 Stuttgart / DE
[1999/14]
Former [1997/34]For all designated states
DAIMLER-BENZ AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Epplestrasse 225
70567 Stuttgart / DE
Former [1997/33]For all designated states
MERCEDES-BENZ AG
Mercedesstrasse 136
70327 Stuttgart / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Papenhagen, Dieter
Salierstrasse 59
71334 Waiblingen / DE
02 / Löchle, Manfred
Am Weissen 18
70329 Stuttgart / DE
03 / Meyer, Thorsten
Böhmerwaldweg 26
70736 Fellbach / DE
[1997/33]
Application number, filing date96110604.401.07.1996
[1997/33]
Priority number, dateDE199513173429.08.1995         Original published format: DE 19531734
[1997/33]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0788921
Date:13.08.1997
Language:DE
[1997/33]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0788921
Date:27.05.1998
[1998/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0788921
Date:29.11.2000
Language:DE
[2000/48]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.04.1998
ClassificationInternational:B60K26/02, G05G1/14
[1998/21]
Former International [1997/33]B60K26/02
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1997/33]
TitleGerman:Trägerrahmen für eine Fahrpedaleinheit von Kraftfahrzeugen[1997/33]
English:Support frame for an accelerator pedal of motor vehicles[1997/33]
French:Cadre de support pour ensemble de pédale d'accélérateur d'automobiles[1997/33]
Examination procedure09.05.1998Examination requested  [1998/28]
10.02.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
05.06.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.07.2000Fee for grant paid
19.07.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)30.08.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.07.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
17.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
14.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]DE9409892U  (A B ELEKTRONIK GMBH) [A] 1;
 DE19503335  [ ] (A B ELEKTRONIK GMBH) [ ] * column 1, line 68 - column 2, line 28 *;
 [A]DE4343681  (PORSCHE AG) [A] 1 * column 1, line 25 - line 48; figure 1; claim 1 *;
 [DA]EP0430600  (STERLING ENGINEERED PRODUCTS L) [DA] 1 * column 1, line 26 - line 35 * * column 2, line 8 - line 16; figures 5,6 *;
 [DA]DE2815769  (DAIMLER BENZ AG) [DA] 1 * page 4, paragraph 3; figure -; claim 1 *