Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0755173

EP0755173 - A fluorescent lamp with end-of-life arc quenching structure [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.02.2001
Database last updated on 20.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.02.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 04.04.2001 [2001/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
OSRAM SYLVANIA INC.
100 Endicott Street
Danvers, MA 01923 / US
[1997/04]
Inventor(s)01 / Shaffer, John W.
9 Tanager Drive
Danvers, MA 01923 / US
[1997/04]
Representative(s)Pokorny, Gerd
OSRAM GmbH
Intellectual Property IP
Postfach 22 13 17
80503 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1997/04]Pokorny, Gerd
c/o Osram Gmbh, Rechts- und Patentabteilung, Postfach 22 16 34
80506 München / DE
Application number, filing date96110692.902.07.1996
[1997/04]
Priority number, dateUS1995050377618.07.1995         Original published format: US 503776
[1997/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0755173
Date:22.01.1997
Language:EN
[1997/04]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0755173
Date:25.02.1998
[1998/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0755173
Date:19.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.01.1998
ClassificationInternational:H05B41/00, H01J7/22, H01J9/24, H01J9/395, H01J61/28, H01J65/04, H01J9/22, H01J61/24, H01J61/72
[1998/06]
Former International [1997/04]H05B41/00
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [1997/04]
TitleGerman:Entladungslampe mit einer Einrichtung zur Lichtbogenunterdrückung an deren Lebensende[1997/04]
English:A fluorescent lamp with end-of-life arc quenching structure[1997/04]
French:Lampe à décharge avec suppression d'arc en fin de vie utile[1997/04]
Examination procedure20.03.1998Examination requested  [1998/21]
09.07.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.11.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.06.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
15.09.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.12.1999Fee for grant paid
06.12.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
20.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[YA]US4495440  (SCHLITT STEVEN C [US], et al) [Y] 1,20 * column 1, lines 1-23 * * column 3, line 55 - column 5, line 48; figures 1-7; claims 1-6 * [A] 2-19;
 [YA]EP0646942  (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [Y] 1,20 * column 1, lines 1-11 * * column 3, line 11 - column 6, line 14; figures 1-3,7 * [A] 2-19;
 [A]JPS6177247
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860826), vol. 010, no. 248, Database accession no. (E - 431), [A] 1-20 * abstract *