Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0755127

EP0755127 - CDMA diversity transmission system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.07.2004
Database last updated on 19.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.07.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 18.08.2004  [2004/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NEC Corporation
7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8001 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2003/35]For all designated states
NEC CORPORATION
7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
Former [1997/04]For all designated states
NEC CORPORATION
7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Yoshida, Shousei
c/o NEC Corp., 7-1, Shiba 5-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP
02 / Ushirokawa, Akihisa
c/o NEC Corp., 7-1, Shiba 5-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP
[1997/04]
Representative(s)Baronetzky, Klaus , et al
Splanemann
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft
Rumfordstrasse 7
80469 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1997/04]Baronetzky, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. R. Splanemann, Dr. B. Reitzner, Dipl.-Ing. K. Baronetzky Tal 13
80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date96111452.716.07.1996
[1997/04]
Priority number, dateJP1995018230519.07.1995         Original published format: JP 18230595
JP1995033915526.12.1995         Original published format: JP 33915595
[1997/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0755127
Date:22.01.1997
Language:EN
[1997/04]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0755127
Date:10.05.2000
[2000/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0755127
Date:27.08.2003
Language:EN
[2003/35]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:H04B1/707, H04B7/04, H04B7/06
[2000/19]
Former International [1997/04]H04B1/707, H04B7/04
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   LI [1997/04]
TitleGerman:Vielfaltnachrichtenübertragungssystem mit Kodemultiplexvielfachzugriff[1997/04]
English:CDMA diversity transmission system[1997/04]
French:Système de transmission en diversité à accès multiple par division de code[1997/04]
Examination procedure28.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/21]
17.12.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.04.2003Fee for grant paid
10.04.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP01114685.9  / EP1133074
Opposition(s)28.05.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.07.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
17.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
16.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
05.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
25.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
21.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[Y]US3717814  (GANS M) [Y] 1,2,4-6 * abstract * * column 1, line 45 - column 2, line 5 * * column 3, line 44 - column 4, line 5 * * figure 1; claims 1,2 *;
 [Y]US5394435  (WEERACKODY VIJITHA [US]) [Y] 1,2,4-6 * abstract * * column 6, line 52 - column 7, line 7 * * column 8, line 12 - line 39 * * claim 1 *;
 [A]GB2237706  (RACAL RES LTD [GB]) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * page 2, line 3 - line 16; claims 1-4 *;
 [A]US5109390  (GILHOUSEN KLEIN S [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * figures 2,3; claim 1 *