Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0756995

EP0756995 - Device for transferring blocks of rod-like articles in the tobacco industry [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.11.2000
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip23.11.2001Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 09.01.2002  [2002/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TOPACK Verpackungstechnik GmbH
Grabauer Strasse 49
21493 Schwarzenbek / DE
[1997/06]
Inventor(s)01 / Vetter, Jürgen
Soltaustrasse 14
21029 Hamburg / DE
[1997/06]
Representative(s)Herrmann, Günther , et al
Hauni Maschinenbau AG, 105/Patentabteilung
21027 Hamburg / DE
[1999/26]
Former [1997/06]Hiss, Ludwig, Pat. Ass. Dipl.-Ing.
c/o Hauni Maschinenbau AG, 105/Patentabteilung, Kampchaussee 8-32
21033 Hamburg / DE
Application number, filing date96111654.819.07.1996
[1997/06]
Priority number, dateDE199512820001.08.1995         Original published format: DE 19528200
[1997/06]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0756995
Date:05.02.1997
Language:DE
[1997/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0756995
Date:05.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.11.1996
ClassificationInternational:B65B35/20, B65B19/22, B65G47/84, B65G29/00
[1997/06]
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [1997/06]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zum Überführen von Packungsblöcken aus stabförmigen Artikeln der tabakverarbeitenden Industrie[1997/06]
English:Device for transferring blocks of rod-like articles in the tobacco industry[1997/06]
French:Dispositif pour transférer des groupes d'articles en forme de tige dans l'industrie du tabac[1997/06]
Examination procedure15.07.1997Examination requested  [1997/37]
25.11.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.03.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.07.1998Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
22.10.1998Observations by third parties
04.12.1998Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.02.1999Fee for grant paid
10.02.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
23.06.1999Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
Opposition(s)06.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/51]
Request for further processing for:06.07.1999Request for further processing filed
06.07.1999Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
17.08.1999Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.07.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
28.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE31.07.2000
[2002/02]
Documents cited:Search[X]FR2218247  (MOLINS LIMITED) [X] 1 * page 25, line 33 - page 26, line 26; figures 11-13,15 *;
 [A]US4144695  (SERAGNOLI) [A] 1 * figure 4 *;
 [A]US4134502  (SERAGNOLI) [A] 1 * column 5, line 51 - column 6, line 20; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US2180163  (MILMOE ET AL.) [A] 1 * figure 1 *;
 [A]US4388989  (EDMUNDS ET AL.) [A] 1 * abstract *
otherUS5163268
 GB2201646
 DE1013482