Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0755728

EP0755728 - Mail processing system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  10.12.2004
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip22.08.2008Change - representativepublished on 24.09.2008  [2008/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA
1-1, Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
[2005/03]
Former [2001/15]For all designated states
KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA
72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 210-8520 / JP
Former [1997/05]For all designated states
KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA
72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku
Kawasaki-shi / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Yui, Hideto, c/o Int.Prop.Div., K.K. Toshiba
1-1 Shibaura 1-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo 105 / JP
[1997/05]
Representative(s)Kramer Barske Schmidtchen Patentanwälte PartG mbB
European Patent Attorneys
Landsberger Strasse 300
80687 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/39]Kramer - Barske - Schmidtchen
European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300
80687 München / DE
Former [2004/26]Kramer - Barske - Schmidtchen
European Patent Attorneys Patenta Radeckestrasse 43
81245 München / DE
Former [1997/05]Blumbach, Kramer & Partner
Patentanwälte Radeckestrasse 43
81245 München / DE
Application number, filing date96111692.819.07.1996
[1997/05]
Priority number, dateJP1995018731124.07.1995         Original published format: JP 18731195
[1997/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0755728
Date:29.01.1997
Language:EN
[1997/05]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0755728
Date:07.01.1998
[1998/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0755728
Date:11.04.2001
Language:EN
[2001/15]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0755728
Date:26.01.2005
Language:EN
[2005/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP19.11.1997
ClassificationInternational:B07C3/20
[1997/05]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1997/05]
TitleGerman:Postverarbeitungssystem[1997/05]
English:Mail processing system[1997/05]
French:Système de traitement de courrier[1997/05]
Examination procedure19.07.1996Examination requested  [1997/05]
02.11.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.02.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.07.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
16.10.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.01.2001Fee for grant paid
04.01.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  19.12.2001  09.01.2002  ADMISSIBLE
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Zier, Peter
c/o Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34
80506 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2008/31]
Opponent(s)01  19.12.2001  09.01.2002  ADMISSIBLE
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Postfach 22 16 34
80506 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Zier, Peter
c/o Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34
80506 München / DE
Former [2002/09]
Opponent(s)01  19.12.2001  09.01.2002  ADMISSIBLE
Siemens AG Abteilung CT IF SD
Postfach 22 16 34
80506 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Zier, Peter
c/o Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34
80506 München / DE
Former [2002/08]
Opponent(s)01  19.12.2001  09.01.2002  ADMISSIBLE
Siemens AG
Postfach 22 16 34
D-80506 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Zier, Peter
c/o Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34
80506 München / DE
21.02.2002Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
20.06.2002Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
25.02.2003Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
20.06.2003Reply to a communication from the opposition division
29.04.2004Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
29.04.2004Date of oral proceedings
24.05.2004Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
24.05.2004Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
08.09.2004Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
26.11.2004Fee for printing new specification paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.07.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
13.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
12.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT11.04.2001
[2008/06]
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0589119  (IBM [US]) [A] 1,2,7,8 * column 7, line 33 - column 9, line 16; figures 3-5 *;
 [A]US4921107  (HOFER JOHN A [US]) [A] 1,2 * column W *;
 [A]EP0148487  (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 3,4 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0635314  (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]) [A] 7,8 * column 3, line 28 - column 5, line 10; figure 1 *
by applicantJP19870170198
Opposition   - Leaflet "Codiersystem COOL-TEC ergänzt die automatische Adresserkennung", issued by AEG Electrocom GmbH, allegedly of May 1993,
    - "Fernkodieranlagen zur automatischen Briefsortierung und -verteilung+", Technische Mitteilungen PTT 11/1991, DS. 481-485,