blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0756086

EP0756086 - Scroll type compressor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.11.2004
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip26.09.2008Change - representativepublished on 29.10.2008  [2008/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DENSO CORPORATION
1-1, Showa-cho, Kariya-City
Aichi-pref., 448 / JP
For all designated states
KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI
2-1, Toyoda-cho
Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP
[N/P]
Former [2001/50]For all designated states
DENSO CORPORATION
1-1, Showa-cho
Kariya-City Aichi-Pref. 448 / JP
For all designated states
Kabushiki Kaisha Toyota Jidoshokki
2-1, Toyoda-cho
Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP
Former [1997/09]For all designated states
DENSO CORPORATION
1-1, Showa-cho
Kariya-City Aichi-Pref. 448 / JP
For all designated states
KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYODA JIDOSHOKKI SEISAKUSHO
2-1, Toyoda-cho
Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP
Former [1997/05]For all designated states
NIPPONDENSO CO., LTD.
1-1, Showa-cho
Kariya-city Aichi-pref., 448 / JP
For all designated states
KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYODA JIDOSHOKKI SEISAKUSHO
2-1, Toyoda-cho
Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Oki, Yasuhiro
c/o Nippondenso Co., Ltd., 1-1, Showa-cho
Kariya-city, Aichi-pref., 448 / JP
02 / Hisanaga, Shigeru
c/o Nippondenso Co., Ltd., 1-1, Showa-cho
Kariya-city, Aichi-pref., 448 / JP
[1997/05]
Representative(s)Klingseisen, Franz, et al
Klingseisen, Rings & Partner
Patentanwälte
Postfach 10 15 61
80089 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/44]Klingseisen, Franz, et al
Klingseisen & Partner Postfach 10 15 61
80089 München / DE
Former [1997/05]Klingseisen, Franz, Dipl.-Ing., et al
Patentanwälte, Dr. F. Zumstein, Dipl.-Ing. F. Klingseisen, Postfach 10 15 61
80089 München / DE
Application number, filing date96111934.424.07.1996
[1997/05]
Priority number, dateJP1995018953225.07.1995         Original published format: JP 18953295
[1997/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0756086
Date:29.01.1997
Language:EN
[1997/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0756086
Date:14.01.2004
Language:EN
[2004/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.12.1996
ClassificationIPC:F04C18/02, F01C17/06
[1997/05]
CPC:
F01C17/063 (EP,US); F01C17/06 (EP,US); F04C18/0215 (EP,US);
F04C29/0057 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   IT [1997/05]
TitleGerman:Spiralverdichter[1997/05]
English:Scroll type compressor[1997/05]
French:Compresseur à spirales[1997/05]
Examination procedure30.04.1997Examination requested  [1997/27]
12.03.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.07.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.07.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.10.2003Fee for grant paid
31.10.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.10.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2005/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.07.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
13.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
12.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
12.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
12.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
14.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[AD]JPS62199983  ;
 [X]EP0652371  (NIPPON DENSO CO [JP], et al) [X] 8-10,12,14 * column 7, line 12 - column 10, line 37; figures 1-5 * * column 12, line 34 - column 13, line 28; figures 8-10 * * column 19, line 7 - column 22, line 40; figures 22-30 *
 [AD]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880217), vol. 12, no. 52, Database accession no. (M - 668), & JP62199983 A 19870903 (NIPPON SOKEN) [AD] 1 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.