Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0755635

EP0755635 - Method and machine for simultaneously producing a number of cigarette rods [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  21.01.2005
Database last updated on 20.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.02.2006Change - lapse in a contracting state
Updated state(s): FR
published on 05.04.2006  [2006/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
G.D SOCIETÀ PER AZIONI
Via Battindarno, 91
40133 Bologna (BO) / IT
[N/P]
Former [2003/31]For all designated states
G.D SOCIETA' PER AZIONI
Via Battindarno, 91
40133 Bologna (BO) / IT
Former [1997/05]For all designated states
G.D SOCIETA' PER AZIONI
Via Pomponia, 10
I-40100 Bologna / IT
Inventor(s)01 / Mengoli, Fausto
Via Vizzano, 32
40037 Sasso Marconi / IT
02 / Sartoni, Massimo
Via Leandro Alberti, 79
40100 Bologna / IT
03 / Draghetti, Fiorenzo
Via San Donino, 506
40059 Medicina / IT
[1997/05]
Representative(s)Jorio, Paolo , et al
Studio Torta S.p.A.
Via Viotti, 9
10121 Torino / IT
[N/P]
Former [1997/05]Jorio, Paolo , et al
Studio Torta, Via Viotti, 9
10121 Torino / IT
Application number, filing date96112053.225.07.1996
[1997/05]
Priority number, dateIT1995BO0037027.07.1995         Original published format: IT BO950370
[1997/05]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0755635
Date:29.01.1997
Language:EN
[1997/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0755635
Date:12.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/15]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0755635
Date:09.03.2005
Language:EN
[2005/10]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.11.1996
ClassificationInternational:A24C5/24, A24C5/18
[1997/05]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1997/05]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Einrichtung zur gleichzeitigen Herstellung einer Anzahl von Tabaksträngen[1997/05]
English:Method and machine for simultaneously producing a number of cigarette rods[1997/05]
French:Procédé de machine pour la fabrication simultanée de plusieurs tiges de cigarette[1997/05]
Examination procedure16.07.1997Examination requested  [1997/39]
01.07.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
06.10.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.12.1999Fee for grant paid
20.12.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  11.01.2001  23.06.2004  WITHDRAWN
Hauni Maschinenbau AG
Kurt-A.-Körber-Chaussee 8 - 32
21033 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Seemann, Ralph
Patentanwälte
Seemann & Partner
Raboisen 6
20095 Hamburg / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2004/36]
Opponent(s)01  11.01.2001  23.06.2004  WITHDRAWN
Hauni Maschinenbau AG
Kurt-A.-Körber-Chaussee 8 - 32
21033 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Seemann, Ralph, Dr. Dipl.-Phys.
Patentanwälte Seemann & Partner, Ballindamm 3
20095 Hamburg / DE
Former [2003/41]
Opponent(s)01  11.01.2001  31.01.2001  ADMISSIBLE
Hauni Maschinenbau AG
Kurt-A.-Körber-Chaussee 8 - 32
21033 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Seemann, Ralph, Dr. Dipl.-Phys.
Patentanwälte Seemann & Partner, Ballindamm 3
20095 Hamburg / DE
Former [2001/10]
Opponent(s)01  11.01.2001  31.01.2001  ADMISSIBLE
Hauni Maschinenbau AG
Kurt-A.-Körber-Chaussee 8 - 32
21033 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Seemann, Ralph, Dr. Dipl.-Phys.
Patentanwälte, Niedmers & Seemann, Van-der-Smissen-Strasse 3
22767 Hamburg / DE
12.03.2001Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
03.09.2001Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
29.01.2003Date of oral proceedings
03.06.2003Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
03.06.2003Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
02.08.2004Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
08.10.2004Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
30.12.2004Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition25.07.2003Appeal received No.  T0747/03
10.10.2003Statement of grounds filed
02.08.2004Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn
15.07.2003Appeal received
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.07.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
26.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR12.04.2000
GB25.07.2000
[2006/14]
Former [2001/28]GB25.07.2000
FR08.09.2000
Former [2001/16]FR08.09.2000
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0275388  (SASIB SPA [IT]) [A] 1,12,13,30 * column W *;
 [A]DE4114070  (HAUNI WERKE KOERBER & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1,12,13,30 * the whole document *;
 [AD]US4336812  (SERAGNOLI ENZO) [AD] 1,12,13,30 * column W *
ExaminationUS5248375
by applicantUS4336812